This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:22:30 (UTC).

Matyascik v. Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Matyascik filed an Other lawsuit against Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is H. Russel Holland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. Russel Holland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Matyascik

Defendants

Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.

Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. doing business as Samuel Simmonds Memorial Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A. Rose

Attorney at North Star Law Group, LLC

4300 B Street, Suite 206

Anchorage, AK 99503

Defendant Attorneys

Richard D. Monkman

Attorney at Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Miller & Munson, LLP (Juneau)

302 Gold Street, Suite 201

Juneau, AK 99801

Kendri M. M. Cesar

Attorney at Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Miller & Munson, LLP (Juneau)

302 Gold Street, Suite 201

Juneau, AK 99801

Rebecca Ann Patterson

Attorney at Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Miller & Munson, LLP (Anch)

900 West 5Th Avenue, Suite 700

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply

#18

17 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#17

#16

#14

10 #7

Exhibit 7 ASNA Funding Agreement

#10

9 #3

Exhibit C Beversdorf v. TCC

9 #2

Exhibit B Bekkum v. SSMH

9 #1

Exhibit A Barnes v Bristol

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)]. Replies due by 7/3/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply)(Monkman, Richard) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Jason Matyascik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE to Terminate Service by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INTERIM SCHEDULING ORDER re #14 Joint Motion re briefing schedule. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/3/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION Briefing Schedule Unopposed by Jason Matyascik.(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re Minute Order Vacated. In light of the filing of the motion to dismiss the court's minute order of 5/9/19, is vacated. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. re #11 Certificate of Service (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Service List, #4 Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Marie Carroll re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Health care delivery for Alaska Natives, #2 Exhibit 2 Alaska Tribal Health Compact, #3 Exhibit 3 ASNA Corporate Bylaws, #4 Exhibit 4 ASNA Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit 5 Physician Employment Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 Temporary Continuation of Coverage Notice Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 ASNA Funding Agreement)(Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Barnes v Bristol, #2 Exhibit B Bekkum v. SSMH, #3 Exhibit C Beversdorf v. TCC)(Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd..(Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ann Patterson on behalf of Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint)(Monkman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. (Monkman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Monkman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arctic Slope Native Association, Ltd. from SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF ALASKA SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT AT UTQIAGVIK, case number 2BA-19-86 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2697678) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint)(Monkman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Aaron Rose