This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:27:07 (UTC).

Matthews v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Matthews filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry A. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04069

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry A. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Matthews

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James C. Wyly

Attorney at Wyly - Rommel, PLLC

4004 Texas Blvd.

Texarkana, TX 75503

Sean F. Rommel

Attorney at Wyly - Rommel, PLLC

4004 Texas Blvd.

Texarkana, TX 75503

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor Matthews. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Executed Summons - Commissioner, #2 Supplement Executed Summons - Regional Chief Counsel)(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Michael J. Astrue for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Commissioner, #2 Summons to Regional Chief Counsel)(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Victor Matthews. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2206373), filed by Victor Matthews.(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mag Consent)(mll) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Victor Matthews. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less