This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 10:49:34 (UTC).

MATTHEWS et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 MATTHEWS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MONSANTO COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOE L. WEBSTER and WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00669

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICKY LEE MATTHEWS

NANCY MATTHEWS

Defendant

MONSANTO COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HENRY FOREST HORNE, JR.

Attorney at MARTIN & JONES, PLLC

410 Glenwood Ave., Ste. 200

Raleigh, NC 27603

CARRIE R. GUEST

Attorney at MARTIN & JONES, PLLC

4140 Parklake Avenue, Suite 400

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to the Northern District of California. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-227) re: MDL 2741 transferring this action to the Northern District of California for reasons stated in the order of August 12, 2020. Received and filed on 8/13/2020. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Related Case(s) (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

7 #1

Consent Form

#7

(#7) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nancy Matthews. (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ricky Lee Matthews. (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HENRY FOREST HORNE, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Matthews, Ricky Lee Matthews (HORNE, HENRY) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARRIE R. GUEST on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Matthews, Ricky Lee Matthews (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2848282.), filed by Ricky Lee Matthews, Nancy Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to the Northern District of California. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-227) re: MDL 2741 transferring this action to the Northern District of California for reasons stated in the order of August 12, 2020. Received and filed on 8/13/2020. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Case(s) (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nancy Matthews. (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ricky Lee Matthews. (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HENRY FOREST HORNE, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Matthews, Ricky Lee Matthews (HORNE, HENRY) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARRIE R. GUEST on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Matthews, Ricky Lee Matthews (GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2848282.), filed by Ricky Lee Matthews, Nancy Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GUEST, CARRIE) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less