This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2021 at 09:38:50 (UTC).

Matthews et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Matthews filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-15584

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAREN MATTHEWS

Robert Matthews

Defendants

& JOHNSON JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY G. SIMON

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

800 Market Streetsuite 1700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Streetsuite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Beth A. Bauer

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Streetp.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM

130 N. Main Streetp.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

#11

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00108. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Karen Matthews, Robert Matthews of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (CMH) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-269) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (CMH) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JKL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S ORDER (GJL). [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:21-CV-00962-UNA] The above styled and numbered case was opened on August 2, 2021 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr., United States District Judge, under cause number 1:21-cv-00108-SNLJ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:21-cv-00962-UNA be administratively closed. (JKL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Scott County, filed by Karen Matthews, Robert Matthews.(JKL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of Scott County, State of MO, case number 21SO-CV00833, with receipt number AMOEDC-8789825, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beth A. Bauer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT A. JAMES