This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2022 at 06:11:39 (UTC).

STUART v. AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 STUART filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01878

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW STUART

Defendant

AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH D. MONACO, III

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH MONACO, PC

7 Penn Plaza

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorney

ERIC R. FISH

Attorney at BAKER HOSTETLER LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC., ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13304723) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STUART MATTHEW.(MONACO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Sara Dikkenberg on 4-11-2022, filed by MATTHEW STUART. (MONACO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC R. FISH on behalf of AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant American Financial Resources, Inc... (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Certification of Joseph Monaco

6 #2

Certification of Joseph Lyon

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; that AFR's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint in this action is hereby extended by thirty (30) days through and including June 15, 2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/12/2022. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#9

(#9) Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#10

(#10) Letter from Eric R. Fish re: Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH LYON, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/24/2022. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Civil Actions No. 22-1757, 22-1878, 22-2392, and 22-2642, are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The Clerk shall establish a Docket for the Actions under Civil Action No. 22-1757 (MCA)(JSA). etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation, Appointment Of Interim Class Counsel and Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH LYON, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/24/2022. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Eric R. Fish re: Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; that AFR's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint in this action is hereby extended by thirty (30) days through and including June 15, 2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/12/2022. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Lyon, Esq. by MATTHEW STUART. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph Monaco, #2 Certification of Joseph Lyon, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MONACO, JOSEPH) Modified on 5/12/2022 (ams, ). (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/16/2022. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant American Financial Resources, Inc... (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC R. FISH on behalf of AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Summons Returned Executed filed by MATTHEW STUART on 4/26/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Affidavit of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return/Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Complaint, please select the event "Summons Returned Executed" found under Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Sara Dikkenberg on 4-11-2022, filed by MATTHEW STUART. (MONACO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Party Information . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketJudge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC., ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13304723) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STUART MATTHEW.(MONACO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Financial Resources Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric R Fish