This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 07:39:56 (UTC).

MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC filed an Other lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01606

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.

Petitioner

APL MARITIME, LTD.

Defendants

MARITIME ADMINISTRATION

DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Andrew Perry

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Joshua M. Wesneski

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Petitioner Attorneys

Brian T Burgess

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

1900 N St Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Gerard Justin Cedrone

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Evan Borson

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#12

(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARITIME ADMINISTRATION served on 6/21/2021 (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 6/25/2021 (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/14/2021. (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/22/2021. (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Justin Cedrone on behalf of APL MARITIME, LTD. (Cedrone, Gerard) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/16/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Wesneski on behalf of MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-2751. (Perry, Mark) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Perry, Mark) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants and Intervenor-Defendant shall file their responses to the complaint on or before August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/02/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARITIME ADMINISTRATION served on 6/21/2021 (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 6/25/2021 (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/14/2021. (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/22/2021. (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of APL Maritime, Ltd.'s unopposed motion to intervene as a defendant, Dkt. #7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that APL Maritime, Ltd. may intervene as a defendant in this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/30/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Justin Cedrone on behalf of APL MARITIME, LTD. (Cedrone, Gerard) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Intervene by APL MARITIME, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/16/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Wesneski on behalf of MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Wesneski, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-2751. (Perry, Mark) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Perry, Mark) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8523429) filed by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Civil Cover Sheet, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons)(Perry, Mark) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APL Maritime, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant