This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:20:49 (UTC).

Matrix Residential LLC v. Scott

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Matrix Residential LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05641

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matrix Residential LLC

1115 Springwood Connector

Atlanta, GA 30328

Defendant

Charles Scott

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Matrix Residential LLC re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. Insufficient Address. Unable to Forward. (tcc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Certified copy of #5 Order e-filed with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Receipt) (tcc). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Matrix Residential LLC re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER - After carefully considering the #3 final report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/7/2020. (tcc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Charles Scott re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/19/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Charles Scott.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

6 #1

Receipt

#3

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/19/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Charles Scott re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Matrix Residential LLC re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (tcc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Matrix Residential LLC re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. Insufficient Address. Unable to Forward. (tcc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Matrix Residential LLC, Charles Scott re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. (tcc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified copy of #5 Order e-filed with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Receipt) (tcc). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (tcc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - After carefully considering the #3 final report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/7/2020. (tcc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Charles Scott, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Matrix Residential LLC, Charles Scott re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (tcc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/19/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(contained w/in #3 Final R&R) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, for the purposes of remand only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/19/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/19/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Charles Scott.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (ah) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Scott. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.