This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 07:56:26 (UTC).

Matosantos Vallecillo et al v. Matosantos Vallecillo et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Matosantos Vallecillo filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Matosantos Vallecillo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01131

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr Manuel Matosantos Vallecillo

Mrs. Gloria Matosantos Vallecillo

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

John and Jane Doe 1 through 10

Mr. Rogelio Munoz

Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc.

Insurance Companies A, B & C

Matosantos Commercial Corporation

Mrs. Franziska Hanreich-Prez

Mr Geronimo Matosantos Vallecillo

Gegloma Realty Corporation

Conjugal Partnership between Perez and Hanreich-Perez

Trusts I & II

Mrs. Cynthia Matosantos de Cardona

Conjugal Partnership between Rogelio Munoz and Alma Biblioni

Mr. Federico Cardona a/k/a Federico Felices

Mrs. Alma Biblioni

Mr. Victor Perez

CC1 Acquisition, LLC

Conjugal Partnership between Federico Cardona and Cynthia Matosantos de Cardona

Federico Cardona-Firpi

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez

Attorney at Sepulvado & Maldonado, PSC

252 Ponce De Leon Ave., Citibank Tower Suite 1900

San Juan, PR 00918

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Luis Sanchez-Betances

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances, Sifre & Munoz-Noya Law Offices, PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Ivan Aponte-Figueroa

Attorney at Carrion Tavarez Law Offices

650 Plaza Suite 204, 650 Munoz Rivera Ave.

San Juan, PR 00918

Luz C. Molinelli-Gonzalez

112 Uruguay St.

San Juan, PR 00917

Joaquin Monserrate-Matienzo

Attorney at Monserrate, Simonet & Gierbolini

Maramar Plaza Suite 1190, 101 San Patricio Ave.

Guaynabo, PR 00968-2646

Miguel Simonet-Sierra

101 Ave. San Patricio, Suite 1120

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Jose L. Ramirez-Coll

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Other Attorneys

Steven Liong-Rodriguez

Attorney at Vicente & Cuebas

P. O. Box 11609

San Juan, PR 00910-1609

Federico Hernandez-Denton

Capitol Center Bldg. South Tower Ph-1, 239 Arterial Hostos Suite 1201

Hato Rey, PR 00918

Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez

Attorney at Vicente & Cuebas

P. O. Box 11609

San Juan, PR 00910-1609

Raul Gonzalez-Toro

Po Box 270343

San Juan, PR 00927-0343

Harold D. Vicente-Colon

Attorney at Vicente & Cuebas

P. O. Box 11609

San Juan, PR 00910-1609

Lee Sepulvado-Ramos

Attorney at Sepulvado, Maldonado & Couret

304 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 990

San Juan, PR 00918

Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina

P.O. Box 22763, Upr Station

San Juan, PR 00931-2763

Edgardo L. Rivera-Rivera

Attorney at The Rivera Group

Po Box 360764

San Juan, PR 00936-0764

Eric A. Tulla

Attorney at Rivera Tulla & Ferrer

50 Quisqueya St.

Hato Rey, PR 00917-1212

Lizabel M. Negron-Vargas

Po Box 360764

San Juan, PR 00936-0764

 

Court Documents

64 #25

Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-32

64 #24

Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-43

64 #23

Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-42

64 #22

Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-40

64 #6

Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-11

7 #27

Exhibit

7 #26

Exhibit

7 #18

Exhibit

7 #17

Exhibit

1 #25

Exhibit

1 #24

Exhibit

1 #21

Exhibit

1 #19

Exhibit

1 #18

Exhibit

1 #17

Exhibit

1 #16

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #7 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-2, #2 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-3, #3 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-4, #4 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-7, #5 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-9, #6 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-11, #7 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-12, #8 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-16, #9 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-18, #10 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-21, #11 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-24, #12 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-25, #13 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-26, #14 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-28, #15 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-29, #16 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-30, #17 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-33, #18 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-35, #19 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-37, #20 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-38, #21 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-39, #22 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-40, #23 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-42, #24 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-43, #25 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-32)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2019 to File Answer re: #7 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Gegloma Realty Corporation Responses due by 4/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) MOTION Submitting Certified Translation filed by Raul Gonzalez-Toro on behalf of Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translation to English language)(Gonzalez-Toro, Raul) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) MOTION Submitting Exhibit C to Docket No. 55 re: #55 Response to Order to Show Cause,, filed by Rogelio Munoz, Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Victor Perez, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc. filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez, Trusts I & II Responses due by 4/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit C - Part 1, #2 Appendix Exhibit C - Part 2, #3 Appendix Exhibit C - Part 3)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, MOTION for Joinder Re: #55 Response to Order to Show Cause,, filed by Rogelio Munoz, Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Victor Perez, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc. filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Tulla, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) STATEMENT Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo re: #30 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commonwealth Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Written Consent, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 29th letter) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/8/2019 to file certified English translations filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MOTION for Leave to File Document with pages in excess filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Alma Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO DISMISS filed by Alma Biblioni, Victor Perez, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Federico Cardona-Firpi, Rogelio Munoz Re: 49 Order,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,, #30 Order filed by Alma Biblioni, Victor Perez, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Federico Cardona-Firpi, Rogelio Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 4/2/2019 to edit event (rom). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Alma Biblioni, CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Jane Doe 1-10, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Gegloma Realty Corporation, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, Insurance Companies A, B & C, John Doe 1-10, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez, Trusts I & II (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for extension of time filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo. Responses due by 3/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal). Added event on 2/22/2019 (idg). (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Verified Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Summons Combined Summons)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Case Status filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Alma Biblioni, CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Gegloma Realty Corporation, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 02/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and, MOTION for extension of time until 3/11/2019 to file Certified English Translations filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6259708.), filed by Gloria Matosantos Vallecillo, Manuel Matosantos Vallecillo. Service due by 5/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Civil Cover Sheet, #46 Category Sheet, #47 Summons)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Companies A, B & C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold D. Vicente-Colon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee Sepulvado-Ramos