This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2020 at 11:21:48 (UTC).

Matos-Lugo v. Hospital Auxilio Mutuo et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2020 Matos-Lugo filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Hospital Auxilio Mutuo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01314

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel M Matos-Lugo

Defendants

Jane Doe

SIMED

Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel

Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez

Patty Poe

Conjugal Partnership Giron-Doe

Hospital Espaol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Hospital Auxilio Mutuo

Patty Doe

Corporation X

The Medical Protective Company d/b/a MedPro Group

Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company

John Doe

Conjugal Partnership Merced-Poe

Sociedad Espanola de Auxilio Mutuo y Beneficiencia de Puerto Rico

Companies A-Z

Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. doing business as Hospital Auxilio Mutuo

The Medical Protective Company doing business as MedPro Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta

Vig Tower Suite Bs-D, 1225 Ave Ponce De Leon

San Juan, PR 00907

Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez

Attorney at Pedro F. Soler Muniz

1357 Ashford Ave., Pmb 106

San Juan, PR 00907

Pedro F. Soler-Muniz

1357 Ashford Ave., Pmb 106

San Juan, PR 00907

Defendant Attorneys

Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez

416 Ave. Escorial, Caparra Heights

San Juan, PR 00920

Eugene F. Hestres-Velez

Attorney at Bird, Bird & Hestres

Po Box 9024040

Old San Juan, PR 00902-4040

Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez

1038 Calle M, Urb. Munoz Rivera

Guaynabo, PR 00969

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel.(Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hestres-Velez, Eugene) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Defendants Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company.(Hestres-Velez, Eugene) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

15 #1

Summons ER Specialized Care, LLC

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Angel M Matos-Lugo. (Attachments: #1 Summons ER Specialized Care, LLC)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to File Document First Amended Complaint filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2020 to File Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) Modified on 8/3/2020 to edit docket text and event type (vso). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez and Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2020 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead, filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez and Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hestres-Velez, Eugene) Modified on 7/29/2020 to edit docket text (vso). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon The Medical Protective Company served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Angel M Matos-Lugo filed by Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez on behalf of Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Martinez, Gilberto) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #15

Summons SIMED

1 #14

Summons PRMD

1 #13

Summons Medical Protective Company

1 #12

Summons CP Merced-Poe

1 #5

Summons Sociedad Espanola

1 #4

Summons Hosp. Auxilio Mutuo

1 #2

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6937797.), filed by Angel M Matos-Lugo. Service due by 10/1/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel AMM, #4 Summons Hosp. Auxilio Mutuo, #5 Summons Sociedad Espanola, #6 Summons Corporation X, #7 Summons Dr. Jessie Giron, #8 Summons Jane Doe, #9 Summons CP Giron-Doe, #10 Summons Dr. Gadiel Merced, #11 Summons Patty Poe, #12 Summons CP Merced-Poe, #13 Summons Medical Protective Company, #14 Summons PRMD, #15 Summons SIMED)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel.(Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hestres-Velez, Eugene) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Defendants Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company.(Hestres-Velez, Eugene) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Angel M Matos-Lugo. (Attachments: #1 Summons ER Specialized Care, LLC)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to File Document First Amended Complaint filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2020 to File Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) Modified on 8/3/2020 to edit docket text and event type (vso). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez and Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2020 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead, filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez and Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hestres-Velez, Eugene) Modified on 7/29/2020 to edit docket text (vso). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon The Medical Protective Company served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Angel M Matos-Lugo filed by Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez on behalf of Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Martinez, Gilberto) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketSIMED terminated. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/27/2020.(EES) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Angel M Matos-Lugo. SIMED waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to SIMED by Angel M Matos-Lugo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Merced-Poe served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020; Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Giron-Doe served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020; Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020; Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020; Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020; Sociedad Espanola de Auxilio Mutuo y Beneficiencia de Puerto Rico served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Giron-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Merced-Poe, Jane Doe, Dr. Jessie Giron-Morel, Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Hospital Auxilio Mutuo, Dr. Gadiel Merced-Alvarez, Patty Poe, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, SIMED, Sociedad Espanola de Auxilio Mutuo y Beneficiencia de Puerto Rico, The Medical Protective Company d/b/a MedPro Group (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fernandez-Muzaurieta, Alejandro) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro F. Soler-Muniz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Soler-Muniz, Pedro) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6937797.), filed by Angel M Matos-Lugo. Service due by 10/1/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel AMM, #4 Summons Hosp. Auxilio Mutuo, #5 Summons Sociedad Espanola, #6 Summons Corporation X, #7 Summons Dr. Jessie Giron, #8 Summons Jane Doe, #9 Summons CP Giron-Doe, #10 Summons Dr. Gadiel Merced, #11 Summons Patty Poe, #12 Summons CP Merced-Poe, #13 Summons Medical Protective Company, #14 Summons PRMD, #15 Summons SIMED)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospital Espaol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Hospital Auxilio Mutuo is a litigant

Latest cases where A.Z. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMED is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico Medical Defense is a litigant