This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2021 at 09:34:07 (UTC).

Matos-Diaz v. Sanchez-Diaz et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Matos-Diaz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sanchez-Diaz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01517

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nizedy Matos-Diaz

Bayamon, PR 00956

Defendants

Jessie Liew Sanchez-Diaz

Office of Federal Employees' Group Life Insurance

Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Rivera-Vargas

720 Calle Hernandezmiramar

San Juan, PR 00907

 

Court Documents

8 #2

USM 285

8 #1

Summons

8 #8

Main Document

7 #3

Summons civil

7 #2

Summons civil

7 #1

Summons civil

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Notice in the Spanish language

6 #6

Main Document

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Nizedy Matos-Diaz, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ab) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

2 #2

Category Sheet

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nizedy Matos-Diaz, Pro Se. Service due by 1/24/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(ab) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Office of Federal Employees' Group Life Insurance, Jessie Liew Sanchez-Diaz through the US Marshals with Copy of Order, Copy of Complaint and USM 285. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2021: #2 USM 285) (ab). Modified on 12/21/2021 to edit docket text(ab). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits summons (Attachments: #1 Summons civil, #2 Summons civil, #3 Summons civil) (Rivera-Vargas, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 5 Order. Attorney Daniel Rivera-Vargas Appointed for Nizedy Matos-Diaz. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice in the Spanish language)(ab)(by mail: Nizedy Matos-Diaz,Daniel Rivera-Vargas) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel: GRANTED. The Clerk will appoint counsel for plaintiff Matos-Diaz pursuant to Local Rule 83L. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/27/2021. (brc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/27/2021. (brc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Nizedy Matos-Diaz, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ab) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nizedy Matos-Diaz, Pro Se. Service due by 1/24/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(ab) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nizedy Matos-Diaz, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Affidavit)(ab) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant