This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 08:57:18 (UTC).

Matos v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 Matos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Greyhound Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-09522

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA MATOS

Defendants

Greyhound Lines, Inc.

John Doe, Intending to be the Operator of the Greyhound Bus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lora Helen Gleicher

Attorney at Silbowitz, Garafola Silbowitz Schatz & Frederick

55 Water Mill Lane, Ste 400

Great Neck, NY 11021

Howard R. Schatz

Attorney at Silbowitz, Garafola, Silbowitz, Schatz & Frederick, LLP

25 West 43Rd Street, Suite 711

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Harold L. Moroknek

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey

287 Bowman Avenue, Suite 404

Purchase, NY 10577

Steven Bradley Saal

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

800 Westchester Avenue

Rye Brook, NY 10573

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Howard R. Schatz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lora Helen Gleicher on behalf of MARIA MATOS..(Gleicher, Lora) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#4

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Howard R. Schatz to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; party name on 'As to' docket entry text must correspond precisely; party name listed on Summons PDF 'TO' field does not correspond to ECF Docket Entry, enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued for; The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested "John Doe" because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#5

No Description Available

#6

(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. and John Doe, Intending to be the Operator of the Greyhound Bus, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Matos..(Schatz, Howard) Modified on 11/15/2022 (sj). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greyhound Lines, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Matos..(Schatz, Howard) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greyhound Lines, Inc..(vf) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold L. Moroknek on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc...(Moroknek, Harold) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Harold L. Moroknek dated 12/15/22. Document filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc...(Moroknek, Harold) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Bradley Saal on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc...(Saal, Steven) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 24, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at Docket Number 10. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/16/2022) (jca) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Greyhound Lines, Inc. answer due 1/24/2023. (jca) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 24, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at Docket Number 10. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/16/2022) (jca) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Bradley Saal on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc...(Saal, Steven) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Harold L. Moroknek dated 12/15/22. Document filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc...(Moroknek, Harold) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold L. Moroknek on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc...(Moroknek, Harold) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greyhound Lines, Inc..(vf) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greyhound Lines, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Matos..(Schatz, Howard) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Howard R. Schatz to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses cannot be issued to John Doe; The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B): a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Howard R. Schatz to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; party name on 'As to' docket entry text must correspond precisely; party name listed on Summons PDF 'TO' field does not correspond to ECF Docket Entry, enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued for; The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested "John Doe" because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. and John Doe, Intending to be the Operator of the Greyhound Bus, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Matos..(Schatz, Howard) Modified on 11/15/2022 (sj). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Howard R. Schatz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Howard R. Schatz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Disbarment Proceedings; Dollar Demand 2,000,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332 Diversity Action; the Dollar Demand has been modified to 2,000,000; the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Howard R. Schatz to Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Civil Cover Sheet is filed as its own individual event. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Howard R. Schatz re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party John Doe with party text " Intending to be the Operator of the Greyhound Bus". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Howard R. Schatz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MARIA MATOS, Greyhound Lines, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lora Helen Gleicher on behalf of MARIA MATOS..(Gleicher, Lora) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of summons in civil action re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MARIA MATOS..(Schatz, Howard) Modified on 11/9/2022 (vf). (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26931650)Document filed by MARIA MATOS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Schatz, Howard) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greyhound Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard R. Schatz