This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:58:21 (UTC).

Matke et al v. Midland Credit Management Inc

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Matke filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01831

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roland Obarski

Deborah Matke

Defendant

Midland Credit Management Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John D Blythin

Attorney at Ademi & O'Reilly LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons on Defendant

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Midland Credit Management Inc by Deborah Matke, Roland Obarski. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3305960) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons on Defendant)(Blythin, John)

1 #2

Exhibit B: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/16/19 that plaintiffs' motion to stay the class certification motion and motion for relief from the local rules #3 are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification #3 is hereby STAYED. No briefing schedule is imposed. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Deborah Matke, Roland Obarski. (Blythin, John)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Certify Class (Fulton Dental / Damasco), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion to certify class until the scheduling conference, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from the Local Rules setting automatic briefing schedules and requiring briefs and supporting material to be filed with the motion (Civil L.R. 7(a), 7(d)) by Deborah Matke, Roland Obarski. (Blythin, John)

1 #4

Exhibit D letter from Defendant to Plaintiff

1 #3

Exhibit C: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff

1 #1

Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midland Credit Management Inc - Waiver sent on 1/28/2020. (Eldridge, Mark)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midland Credit Management Inc - Waiver sent on 1/28/2020. (Eldridge, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/16/19 that plaintiffs' motion to stay the class certification motion and motion for relief from the local rules #3 are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification #3 is hereby STAYED. No briefing schedule is imposed. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management Inc (jcl) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Certify Class (Fulton Dental / Damasco), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion to certify class until the scheduling conference, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from the Local Rules setting automatic briefing schedules and requiring briefs and supporting material to be filed with the motion (Civil L.R. 7(a), 7(d)) by Deborah Matke, Roland Obarski. (Blythin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Deborah Matke, Roland Obarski. (Blythin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Midland Credit Management Inc by Deborah Matke, Roland Obarski. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3305960) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons on Defendant)(Blythin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.