This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:51:55 (UTC).

MATIAS et al v. APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 MATIAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jessica S. Allen and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-11177

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOAO MATIAS

ARMANDA MATIAS

Defendants

A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC.

JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitious designations)

APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC.

XYZ ENTITIES 1-10

MAERSK SERVICES USA INC.

MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC.

MAERSK, INC.

A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC

MAERSK A/S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL G. DONAHUE

Attorney at STARK & STARK

P.O. Box 5315

Princeton, NJ 08543

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN F. KARPOUSIS

Attorney at FREEHILL, HOGAN & MAHAR LLP

Suite 400, 103 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

MICHAEL DAVID TUCKER

Attorney at FREEHILL HOGAN & MAHAR LLP

549 Summit Avenue

Jersey City, NJ 07306

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Summons, Complaint, Proofs of Service)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Summons, Complaint, Proofs of Service)

6 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Amended JS-44

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/2/21. (jbb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PARTIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiffs' suit against the following defendants is dismissed without prejudice, without interest or costs to any party as against the others: APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC., A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S, A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC., MAERSK, INC., MAERSK A/S, MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC., MAERSK SERVICES USA INC.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/28/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC (Amended Notice) from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Union Vicinage, case number UNN-L-1388-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12496130), filed by APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Summons, Complaint, Proofs of Service), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended JS-44)(TUCKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC identifying UNIVERSAL MARITIME SERVICE CORP. as Corporate Parent.. (TUCKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Parties Without Prejudice by A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S, A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC., APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC, APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC., MAERSK A/S, MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC., MAERSK SERVICES USA INC., MAERSK, INC.. (TUCKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S, A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC., APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC, APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC., MAERSK A/S, MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC., MAERSK SERVICES USA INC., MAERSK, INC..(TUCKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DAVID TUCKER on behalf of A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S, A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC., APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC, APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC., MAERSK A/S, MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC., MAERSK SERVICES USA INC., MAERSK, INC. (TUCKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MAERSK A/S, A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S, MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC., APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC, MAERSK SERVICES USA INC., A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC., APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC., MAERSK, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Union Vicinage, case number UNN-L-1388-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12460042), filed by MAERSK A/S, A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S, MAERSK AGENCY USA, INC., APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH, LLC, MAERSK SERVICES USA INC., A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK INC., APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA, INC., MAERSK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Summons, Complaint, Proofs of Service), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KARPOUSIS, JOHN) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APM TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MAERSK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MAERSK AGENCY U.S.A. INC. (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant