This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:42:54 (UTC).

Mathis v. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Mathis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirtan Khalsa and Kevin R. Sweazea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugenio Mathis

Defendants

Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC

MHM Health Professionals Inc

Lovelace Health System LLC

Gary French

Murray Young

James Bradley

Vesta Sandoval

Ellen Whittman

Erin Forsberg

John Gay

David Selvage

Vicki Bowers

FNU Archuleta

FNU Palomino

FNU Abate

Anthony Martinez

FNU Ortiz

Control Officer Day Shift L Pod

Dr. Doe 1-2 Doctors

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth M. Piazza

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880, 87199

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Julia H. Purdy

Attorney at Guebert Gentile Piazza Pc

6801 Jefferson Ne, Ste 400

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Robert Gentile

Attorney at Guebert Bruckner PC

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199

Terry R. Guebert

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199-3880

Parrish Collins

P. O. Box 506

Albuquerque, NM 87103-0506

Defendant Attorneys

Alfred A Park

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Masthead St., N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Taylor M. Lueras

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Masthead St. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, MHM Health Professionals Inc.(Lueras, Taylor) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

2 #11

Exhibit 11

2 #9

Exhibit 9

2 #8

Exhibit 8

2 #7

Exhibit 7

2 #6

Exhibit 6

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #2

Main Document

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Amended Complaint Issued as to John Gay, Anthony Martinez, FNU Palomino. (jg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, MHM Health Professionals Inc.(Lueras, Taylor) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor M. Lueras on behalf of Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, MHM Health Professionals Inc (Lueras, Taylor) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Eugenio Mathis (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Lovelace Health System LLC served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. MHM Health Professionals Inc served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Vicki Bowers served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. David Selvage served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Erin Forsberg served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. James Bradley served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. Vesta Sandoval served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Mathis. FNU Archuleta served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to FNU Archuleta, Vicki Bowers, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Estate of James Bradley, Erin Forsberg, Gary French, Lovelace Health System LLC, MHM Health Professionals Inc, Vesta Sandoval, David Selvage, Ellen Whittman, Murray Young. (dr) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. adding Estate of James Bradley. terminating James Bradley (Dr. )., filed by Eugenio Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8064052 re #1 Complaint, filed by Eugenio Mathis (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Collins, Parrish) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Eugenio Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Parrish) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MHM Health Professionals, Inc. is a litigant