This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2019 at 07:21:26 (UTC).

Mathewson et al v. City of Kirkland

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Mathewson filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against City of Kirkland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01705

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kirk Mathewson

ANV LLC

Thatcher Mathewson

Tapps LLC

Celane LLC

Carol Mathewson

Defendant

City of Kirkland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kit W Roth

Attorney at GOLDFARB & HUCK ROTH RIOJAS, PLLC

925 Fourth Avenue, Ste 3950

Seattle, WA 98104

Rogelio Omar Riojas

Attorney at GOLDFARB & HUCK ROTH RIOJAS, PLLC

925 Fourth Avenue, Ste 3950

Seattle, WA 98104

Christopher M Huck

Attorney at GOLDFARB & HUCK ROTH RIOJAS, PLLC

925 Fourth Avenue, Ste 3950

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Eglick

Attorney at EGLICK WHITED PLLC

1000 Second Avenue, Ste 3130

Seattle, WA 98104

Stephanie E Croll

Attorney at CITY OF KIRKLAND

123 Fifth Avenue

Kirkland, WA 98033

Joshua Adam Whited

Attorney at EGLICK WHITED PLLC

1000 Second Avenue, Ste 3130

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

15 #5

Exhibit Document D - Insurance Documentation

15 #4

Exhibit 4

15 #3

Exhibit 3

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

City's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant City of Kirkland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Document D - Insurance Documentation)(Croll, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Joshua Adam Whited on behalf of Defendant City of Kirkland. (Whited, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on City of Kirkland on 10/28/2019, filed by Plaintiffs ANV LLC, Celane LLC, Carol Mathewson, Thatcher Mathewson, Kirk Mathewson, Tapps LLC. (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRAECIPE by Defendant City of Kirkland (Attachments: #1 City's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Croll, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTE: Answer #11 . Appearance of attorney Josh Whited is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. In addition, this document is not dated. Please file a Praecipe to Attach Document with a properly dated and signature page. Mr. Whited may also file a separate Notice of Appearance. (PM) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint; Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by City of Kirkland.(Croll, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/26/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Peter J Eglick on behalf of Defendant City of Kirkland. (Eglick, Peter) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephanie E Croll on behalf of Defendant City of Kirkland. (Croll, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Kirkland. (SNP) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, Summons to City of Kirkland by Plaintiffs ANV LLC, Celane LLC, Carol Mathewson, Thatcher Mathewson, Kirk Mathewson, Tapps LLC (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tapps LLC (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Celane LLC (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ANV LLC (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs ANV LLC, Celane LLC, Carol Mathewson, Thatcher Mathewson, Kirk Mathewson, Tapps LLC. (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) City of Kirkland (Receipt # 0981-5976680) Attorney Kit W Roth added to party ANV LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kit W Roth added to party Celane LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kit W Roth added to party Carol Mathewson(pty:pla), Attorney Kit W Roth added to party Thatcher Mathewson(pty:pla), Attorney Kit W Roth added to party Kirk Mathewson (pty:pla), Attorney Kit W Roth added to party Tapps LLC(pty:pla), filed by Tapps LLC, Kirk Mathewson, ANV LLC, Thatcher Mathewson, Carol Mathewson, Celane LLC.(Roth, Kit) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less