This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:13:52 (UTC).

Mathews v. Mainspring Management LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Mathews filed an Other lawsuit against Mainspring Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Howard F. Sachs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-06118

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard F. Sachs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Mathews

Defendant

Mainspring Management LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jayson A. Watkins

Attorney at Brown & Watkins, LLC

301 S. Us 169 Highway

Gower, MO 64454

Charles Jason Brown

Attorney at Brown & Watkins, LLC

301 S. Us 169 Highway

Gower, MO 64454

Defendant Attorney

Kersten Holzhueter

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-KCMO

1000 Walnut Street, Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64106-2140

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of settlement by Mainspring Management LLC (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc 7) is granted. Mainspring Management LLC's answer is due 9/23/2020. Signed on 8/20/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Mainspring Management LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit 1- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) NOTICE of filing Notice in State Court by Mainspring Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/28/2020. Signed on 8/18/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Defendant Mainspring Management LLC.(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Mainspring Management LLC (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clinton County County, case number 20CN-CC00043, filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Mainspring Management LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6998361. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of settlement by Mainspring Management LLC (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc 7) is granted. Mainspring Management LLC's answer is due 9/23/2020. Signed on 8/20/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Mainspring Management LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of filing Notice in State Court by Mainspring Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/28/2020. Signed on 8/18/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Defendant Mainspring Management LLC.(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Mainspring Management LLC (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clinton County County, case number 20CN-CC00043, filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Mainspring Management LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6998361. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holzhueter, Kersten) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less