This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 14:04:12 (UTC).

Matherne et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Matherne filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02656

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Giselle Matherne Ordoyne

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Cross Claimants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Pennsylvania General Insurance Company

Eagle, Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Foster-Wheeler LLC

General Electric Company

Paramount Global

Uniroyal, Inc.

International Paper Company

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Pennsylvania General Insurance Company

Eagle, Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Foster-Wheeler LLC

General Electric Company

Paramount Global

Uniroyal, Inc.

International Paper Company

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerolyn Petit Roussel

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Benjamin Peter Dinehart

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alison A. Spindler

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Thomas Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Connor Peth

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Darleene D. Peters

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Kimmier L. Paul

Attorney at Blue Williams

3421 N Causeway Blvd, Ste 9Th Floor

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Matthew J Averill

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Kevin Powell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

35 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) ANSWER to #20 Crossclaim and Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.(Adams, Desiree) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (cg). (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#40

(#40) REPLY in Support to Response to Motion filed by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (cg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#39

(#39) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/21/22. (cg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

37 #3

Proposed Pleading

37 #2

Proposed Order

37 #1

Memorandum in Support

#37

(#37) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#35

(#35) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company Identifying Corporate parent as National Indemnity Company. (Adams, Desiree) Modified added corporate parent. on 9/15/2022 (cg). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#20

(#41) ANSWER to #20 Crossclaim and Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.(Adams, Desiree) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (cg). (Entered: 09/26/2022)

4 #6

Exhibit 3

4 #5

Exhibit 2

4 #4

Exhibit 1

4 #3

Memorandum in Support

4 #2

Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts

#3

(#3) Directive of the Clerk Regarding Compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ANSWER to #20 Crossclaim and Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.(Adams, Desiree) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (cg). (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) REPLY in Support to Response to Motion filed by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (cg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/21/22. (cg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #37 MOTION for Leave to File. Document Caption contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section J, Judge Carl J. Barbier. Please correct caption for future pleadings. (cg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #35 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. For future filings, add all corporate parents when prompted by the screen. Clerk took corrective action. ALSO, the caption contains the incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section J, Judge Barbier. (cg) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company Identifying Corporate parent as National Indemnity Company. (Adams, Desiree) Modified added corporate parent. on 9/15/2022 (cg). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (gec) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to #1 Complaint - Notice of Removal Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified link on 9/14/2022 (gec). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ted J Matherne, Sr, Ted J Matherne, Jr, Giselle Matherne Ordoyne, Vanessa Matherne Richardson (Clement, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure: Document caption contains incorrect case number. All future filings should reflect case number 22-2656. (ko) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) Modified text/filerson 8/17/2022 (ko). (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:dft).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text/filers on 8/17/2022 (ko). (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.Attorney Desiree Weilbaecher Adams added to party Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Adams, Desiree) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)Attorney Samuel Milton Rosamond, III added to party Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association(pty:dft).(Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk Regarding Compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2022-5989 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9495972) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant