This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:56:09 (UTC).

Mather v. Coil et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Mather filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Coil. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam E Haddon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam E Haddon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalie Mather

Kallispell, MT 59901

Defendants

St. Peter's Hospital

Andy Coil

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Letter from Mather. Docket sheet mailed to Mather with information that mail to Clerk may be directed to Missoula Office address (TAG) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE re Address by Natalie Mather (MPB) Modified on 12/10/2020 to clarify document description (TAG). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#14

(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail resent to Natalie Mather at new Kalispell address. (HEG) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#13

(#13) Mail sent to Mather re #4 Returned as Undeliverable. Remailed to address given in #12 (TAG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Direct Service by Plaintiff Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

9 #1

Letter

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Natalie Mather. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (TAG) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Amended Complaint due 11/20/20. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/9/2020. Mailed to Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner by Plaintiff Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#5

(#5) Mail sent to Mather re #3 Returned as Undeliverable. Remailed to General delivery address (TAG) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDERED: Mather's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The clerk shall waive payment of the filing fee. On or before November 13, 2020, Mather may submit an amended complaint. Copy mailed to Mather. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/19/2020. (HEG) Modified on 10/21/2020 to clarify text (HEG). Modified on 11/5/2020: mailed to Mather at address given in #6 (TAG). Modified on 11/6/2020: copy emailed to Stephen Kelly at his request (TAG). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Mather with docket sheet (TAG) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Natalie Mather. (TAG) Modified on 11/9/2020: complaint deemed filed (TAG). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter from Mather. Docket sheet mailed to Mather with information that mail to Clerk may be directed to Missoula Office address (TAG) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE re Address by Natalie Mather (MPB) Modified on 12/10/2020 to clarify document description (TAG). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail resent to Natalie Mather at new Kalispell address. (HEG) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Mail sent to Mather re #4 Returned as Undeliverable. Remailed to address given in #12 (TAG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Direct Service by Plaintiff Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Natalie Mather. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (TAG) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Amended Complaint due 11/20/20. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/9/2020. Mailed to Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner by Plaintiff Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail sent to Mather re #3 Returned as Undeliverable. Remailed to General delivery address (TAG) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED: Mather's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The clerk shall waive payment of the filing fee. On or before November 13, 2020, Mather may submit an amended complaint. Copy mailed to Mather. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/19/2020. (HEG) Modified on 10/21/2020 to clarify text (HEG). Modified on 11/5/2020: mailed to Mather at address given in #6 (TAG). Modified on 11/6/2020: copy emailed to Stephen Kelly at his request (TAG). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Mather with docket sheet (TAG) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Natalie Mather. (TAG) Modified on 11/9/2020: complaint deemed filed (TAG). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Natalie Mather (TAG) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less