This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:30:14 (UTC).

Matey v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Matey filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00841

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irma Matey

Richard D. Matey

Defendants

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Buffalo Pumps, Inc.

Crane Co.

Deming Pump Co.

Cochrane Corporation

Chapman Valve Co.

National-US Radiator Corp.

Swartwout Co.

Pacific Steel Boiler Corporation

General Electric Company

Viacom CBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom Inc.

BW/IP, Inc.

Byron Jackson Pumps

Carrier Corporation

United Technologies Corp.

Bryant Heating

Caterpillar, Inc.

Derbyshire Machine & Tool Co.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lydia A. Plotz

Attorney at Vinson Law PA

5505 W. Grey St.

Tampa, FL 33609

Alexis Thomas

Attorney at Vinson Law PA

5505 W Gray St

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

Rasheem Malik Johnson

Attorney at Kl Gates

200 S Biscayne Blvd, Suite 39Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Christopher J. M. Collings

Attorney at Collings Law Firm

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Erin Dardis

701 Brickell Avenue., 17Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-1806

Erin E. Dardis

Attorney at Collings Law Firm

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Todd Carlton Alley

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

4000 Suntrust Plaza, 303 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Caitlyn R. McCutcheon

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131-2339

Timothy J. Ferguson

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Suite 1000, 4770 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33137

Other Attorneys

John Charles Reddin

Attorney at Luks Santaniello Petrillo & Cohen

150 West Flagler Street, Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33130

Edward J. Briscoe

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett, PA

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1950

Miami, FL 33131-3353

Peter J. Melaragno

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1950

Miami, FL 33131-3353

Charles Edward Reynolds, II

Attorney at Tyson and Mendes LLP

101 Ne 3Rd Ave., Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Eduardo J. Medina

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Suite 1000, 4770 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33137

Amanda Rae Cachaldora

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm, PL

Suite 710, 999 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Melanie E. Chung-Tims

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm, PL

Suite 710, 999 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Scott A. Tacktill

Attorney at The Unger Law Group, PL

1427 Lake Baldwin Lane Unit A

Orlando, FL 32814

Stuart L. Cohen

Attorney at Luks, Santaniello, Petrillo & Jones LLC

Suite 2600, 150 W. Flagler Street

Miami, FL 33130

Albert Michael Perotti

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

4200 W. Cypress Street, Suite 450

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#93

(#93) NOTICE of change of address by Charles Edward Reynolds, II (Reynolds, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#92

(#92) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tate. (Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#91

(#91) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tate. Related case(s): Yes (Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#90

(#90) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by January 9, 2023. Dispositive motions due by April 21, 2023. Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 12, 2023 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the November 2023 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by June 2, 2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/9/2022. (GSO) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#89

(#89) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tate.(Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#88

(#88) NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Michael Perotti on behalf of Tate (Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#87

(#87) NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc. of Unavailability (Reynolds, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#85

(#85) NOTICE of change of address by Christopher J. M. Collings (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#73

(#86) ENDORSED ORDER: The Court vacates its earlier 74 endorsed order, directs the Clerk to reinstate Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance as a party, and directs the Clerk to strike Plaintiff's and Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance's #73 notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) because the stipulation was not signed by all parties who have appeared as required by the rule for dismissal of any party under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties may refile the stipulation with the requisite signatures or move for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/24/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit F to Notice of Removal

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

1 #2

State Court ANSWER GE Answer to Complaint

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Combined State Court Complaints

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, case number 22-CA-001775 filed in State Court 3/2/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19440711 filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT; Combined State Court Complaints, #2 State Court ANSWER; GE Answer to Complaint, #3 State Court Docket Sheet; Combined Dockets, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal)(Collings, Christopher) Modified on 4/11/2022 (LNR). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE of change of address by Charles Edward Reynolds, II (Reynolds, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tate. (Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tate. Related case(s): Yes (Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by January 9, 2023. Dispositive motions due by April 21, 2023. Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 12, 2023 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the November 2023 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by June 2, 2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/9/2022. (GSO) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tate.(Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Michael Perotti on behalf of Tate (Perotti, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc. of Unavailability (Reynolds, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ENDORSED ORDER: The Court vacates its earlier 74 endorsed order, directs the Clerk to reinstate Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance as a party, and directs the Clerk to strike Plaintiff's and Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance's #73 notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) because the stipulation was not signed by all parties who have appeared as required by the rule for dismissal of any party under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties may refile the stipulation with the requisite signatures or move for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/24/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) NOTICE of change of address by Christopher J. M. Collings (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cachaldora, Amanda) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Paramount Global. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc..(Melaragno, Peter) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(Melaragno, Peter) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Melaragno, Peter) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0841-KKM-SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, case number 22-CA-001775 filed in State Court 3/2/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19440711 filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT; Combined State Court Complaints, #2 State Court ANSWER; GE Answer to Complaint, #3 State Court Docket Sheet; Combined Dockets, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal)(Collings, Christopher) Modified on 4/11/2022 (LNR). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BUFFALO PUMPS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BW/IP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARRIER CORPORATION is a litigant