This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:04:17 (UTC).

Materna v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Materna filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02224

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Claire Materna

Defendants

JOHN DOE-1

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Temiika Gipson

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis P. Chiozza, Jr.

Attorney at CHIOZZA & ASSOCIATES

230 Adams Ave.

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Peter B. Winterburn

Attorney at LEWIS THOMASON KING KRIEG & WALDROP, P.C.

40 S. Main Street, Suite 2900

Memphis, TN 38103

Isaac Salomon Lew

Attorney at LEWIS THOMASON

One Commerce Square, 40 S. Main St., 29Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Salomon Lew on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Lew, Isaac) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0926-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3037491), filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Winterburn, Peter) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Winterburn, Peter) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd., Other Affiliate Softbank Group Corp. for Uber Technologies, Inc... (Lew, Isaac) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd., Other Affiliate Softbank Group Corp. for Uber Technologies, Inc... (Lew, Isaac) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Salomon Lew on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Lew, Isaac) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Winterburn, Peter) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note "wet signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Polices and Procedures 10.1 Effectiveness of Electronic Signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0926-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3037491), filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Winterburn, Peter) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.