This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2022 at 09:50:28 (UTC).

Ernesto Mata v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Ernesto Mata filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01751

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernesto Mata

Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A., INC.

Ridge Tool Co.

Emerson Electric Co.

Ridge Tool Company

Does 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Igor Fradkin

Attorney at Downtown LA Law Group

601 North Vermont Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendant Attorneys

Paul T. Martin

Attorney at Hennelly and Grossfeld LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Samuel B Laughlin

Attorney at Hennelly and Grossfeld LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REFUND OF $402.00 made payable on 04/15/2022 to Kunji Wang for payment made on 03/16/2022 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid #10 . (rdj) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Company. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Company. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #2 (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

2 #24

Exhibit Ex 23 - Printout of listing on California Secretary of State website for

2 #22

Exhibit Ex 21 - Printout of state court docket

2 #21

Exhibit Ex 20 - Ridge Tool and Emerson Answer (State Court)

2 #19

Exhibit Ex 18 - Mata Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Emerson (State

2 #18

Exhibit Ex 17 - Mata Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Home Depot (St

2 #17

Exhibit Ex 16 - Certificate of Mailing of PI General Order, Standing Order re PI

2 #13

Exhibit Ex 12 - Informal Discovery Conference Form

2 #12

Exhibit Ex 11 - Stipulation - Discovery Resolution Form

2 #9

Exhibit Ex 8 - Sixth Amended Standing Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference

2 #8

Exhibit Ex 7 - Amended Supplemental Standing Order re COVID Protective Measures

2 #7

Exhibit Ex 6 - Third Amended Standing Order re Final Status Conference, Personal

2 #6

Exhibit Ex 5 - First Amended Standing Order re Personal Injury

2 #5

Exhibit Ex 4 - Notice of Case Assignment (State Court)

2 #3

Exhibit Ex 2 - Mata Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, ADR Package (State Court)

2 #2

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REFUND OF $402.00 made payable on 04/15/2022 to Kunji Wang for payment made on 03/16/2022 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid #10 . (rdj) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Company. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Company. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #2 (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co... (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co. identifying EECO, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co.. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV46454 with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 03/16/2022, receipt number 32959649), filed by defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Laughlin, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Mata Complaint (State Court), #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Mata Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, ADR Package (State Court), #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Mata Statement of Damages (State Court), #5 Exhibit Ex 4 - Notice of Case Assignment (State Court), #6 Exhibit Ex 5 - First Amended Standing Order re Personal Injury, #7 Exhibit Ex 6 - Third Amended Standing Order re Final Status Conference, Personal Injury Courts, #8 Exhibit Ex 7 - Amended Supplemental Standing Order re COVID Protective Measures, #9 Exhibit Ex 8 - Sixth Amended Standing Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference, #10 Exhibit Ex 9 - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations, #11 Exhibit Ex 10 - Stipulation - Early Organizational Meeting, #12 Exhibit Ex 11 - Stipulation - Discovery Resolution Form, #13 Exhibit Ex 12 - Informal Discovery Conference Form, #14 Exhibit Ex 13 - Stipulation and Order - Motions in Limine Form, #15 Exhibit Ex 14 - Order Pursuant to CCP 1054(a) Extending Time to Respond, #16 Exhibit Ex 15 - Standing Order re Personal Injury Procedures, #17 Exhibit Ex 16 - Certificate of Mailing of PI General Order, Standing Order re PI Procedures, #18 Exhibit Ex 17 - Mata Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Home Depot (State Court), #19 Exhibit Ex 18 - Mata Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Emerson (State Court), #20 Exhibit Ex 19 - Home Depot Answer (State Court), #21 Exhibit Ex 20 - Ridge Tool and Emerson Answer (State Court), #22 Exhibit Ex 21 - Printout of state court docket, #23 Exhibit Ex 22 - Printout of listing on Ohio Secretary of State website for Ridge Tool, #24 Exhibit Ex 23 - Printout of listing on California Secretary of State website for Emerson, #25 Exhibit Ex 24 - Printout of listing on California Secretary of State website for Home Depot) (Attorney Samuel B Laughlin added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel B Laughlin added to party Ridge Tool Co.(pty:dft))(Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDGE TOOL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul T. Martin Esq.