This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2022 at 09:53:52 (UTC).

Ernesto Mata v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Ernesto Mata filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01758

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernesto Mata

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., a Delaware Corporation

Ridge Tool Co.

Emerson Electric Co.

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Ridge Tool Company

Does 1-50 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Igor Fradkin

Attorney at Downtown LA Law Group

601 North Vermont Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Kenneth Dixon

Attorney at Sanders Roberts LLP

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Samuel B Laughlin

Attorney at Hennelly and Grossfeld LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Paul T. Martin

Attorney at Hennelly and Grossfeld LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Matthew John Lippold

Attorney at Sanders Roberts LLP

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ernesto Mata, identifying Home Depot U.S.A.; Ridge Tool Co.; Emerson Electric Co.. (Fradkin, Igor) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

17 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

17 #1

Declaration Declaration of Igor Fradkin

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

14 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court of Removal of Action to

14 #14

Main Document

#12

(#12) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-01758 FMO(AFMx). (ap) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

1 #24

Exhibit 23- Printout of a true and correct copy of the listing on the California

1 #22

Exhibit 21- Printout of a true and correct copy of state court docket

1 #18

Exhibit 17- Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff on Febr

1 #14

Exhibit 13- Stipulation and Order Motions in Limine Form

1 #12

Exhibit 11- Stipulation Discovery Resolution Form

1 #7

Exhibit 6- Third Amended Standing Order Re: FSC, Personal Injury

1 #6

Exhibit 5- First Amended Standing Order Re: Personal Injury

1 #5

Exhibit 4- Notice of the Case Assignment

1 #1

Main Document

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ernesto Mata, identifying Home Depot U.S.A.; Ridge Tool Co.; Emerson Electric Co.. (Fradkin, Igor) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court Spring Street Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Ernesto Mata. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Igor Fradkin, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fradkin, Igor) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. In light of the transfer of this action to the calendar of the Honorable Fernando M. Olguin, the Scheduling Meeting of Counsel #11 set for May 2, 2022 is hereby vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Company, Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court served on April 1, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court)(Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-01758 FMO(AFMx). (ap) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-33004595 for $402 filing fee. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Submitted with Attachment 20 Exhibit 19 to Notice of Removal #1 .(car) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Ernesto Mata, upon Defendant Emerson Electric Co. served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/25/2022 Submitted with Attachment 18 Exhibit 19 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Ernesto Mata, upon Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 3/3/2022 Submitted with Attachment 18 Exhibit 17 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Emerson Electric Co., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Ridge Tool Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ernesto Mata. Filed in State Court on 12/21/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., a Delaware Corporation, identifying Home Depot, Inc.; Home Depot USA, Inc.; Ernesto Mata; Ridge Tool Co.; Emerson Electric Co.. (Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft))(Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL filed by DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEFENDANTS RIDGE TOOL CO. AND EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co., (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co.. (Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV46454 with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 03/16/2022, receipt number 32959649), filed by Defendants Emerson Electric Co., Ridge Tool Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel B. Laughlin in Support of Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 1- December 21, 2021, Complaint filed by plaintiff ERNESTO MATA, #3 Exhibit 2- Plaintiffs Summons to Defendants Ridge Tool Company and Emerson, #4 Exhibit 3- Plaintiffs Statement of Damages, #5 Exhibit 4- Notice of the Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit 5- First Amended Standing Order Re: Personal Injury, #7 Exhibit 6- Third Amended Standing Order Re: FSC, Personal Injury, #8 Exhibit 7- Amended Supplemental Standing Order, #9 Exhibit 8- Sixth Amended Standing Order RE: Mandatory Settlement Conference, #10 Exhibit 9- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations, #11 Exhibit 10- Stipulation Early Organizational Meeting for the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, #12 Exhibit 11- Stipulation Discovery Resolution Form, #13 Exhibit 12- Informal Discovery Conference Form, #14 Exhibit 13- Stipulation and Order Motions in Limine Form, #15 Exhibit 14- Order Pursuant to CCP 1054(a), Extending Time to Respond, #16 Exhibit 15- Standing Order Re: Personal Injury Procedures, Central District, #17 Exhibit 16- Certificate of Mailing of PI General Order, Standing Order Re PI Procedures and Hearing Date, #18 Exhibit 17- Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff on February 25, 2022, #19 Exhibit 18- Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff on February 25, 2022, #20 Exhibit 19- Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.s Answer, #21 Exhibit 20- Defendants Ridge Tool and Emersons Answer, #22 Exhibit 21- Printout of a true and correct copy of state court docket, #23 Exhibit 22- Printout of a true and correct copy of the listing on the Ohio Secretary of States website, #24 Exhibit 23- Printout of a true and correct copy of the listing on the California Secretary of States website, #25 Exhibit 24- Printout of a true and correct copy of the listing on the California Secretary of States website) (Attorney Samuel B Laughlin added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel B Laughlin added to party Ridge Tool Co.(pty:dft))(Laughlin, Samuel) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDGE TOOL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul T. Martin Esq.