This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 08:54:03 (UTC).

Masters v. Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Masters filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02126

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willard Masters, III

Defendants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.

CEMEX Material, LLC

Burmaster Land & Development Co., LLC

Level 3 Holdings, Inc.

Morse TEC LLC

Schneider Electric USA, Inc.

Graybar Electric Company, Inc.

Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.

Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.

Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.

Avondale Industries, Inc.

Avondale Shipyards, Inc

Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.

Union Carbide Corporation

I.C. Electric Supply

St. Joseph The Worker Roman Church, Marrero, Louisiana

Genuine Parts Company individually and d/b/a/NAPA branded products

Rinker Materials, LLC

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremiah S. Boling

Attorney at Boling Law Firm

1100 Poydras Street Suit 2900, 70163

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas J. Cortazzo

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois New Orleans

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Shannon C. Burr

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Susan Grace Keller-Garcia

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Remand Letter

#8

(#8) ORDER AND REASONS granting #4 Emergency Motion to Remand to State Court for the reasons stated herein. This matter is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/18/2021. (mm) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (mm). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

7 #7

Exhibit Ex 7 - Notice to Parties and State Court Removal

7 #5

Exhibit Ex 5 - Email from court reporter

7 #4

Exhibit Ex 4 - Emails to court reporter

7 #2

Exhibit Ex 2 - Jury Interrogatories

4 #11

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

4 #10

Exhibit

4 #9

Exhibit

4 #8

Exhibit

4 #7

Exhibit

4 #6

Exhibit

4 #5

Exhibit

4 #4

Exhibit

4 #3

Exhibit

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Willard Masters, III. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Notice of Submission)(Boling, Jeremiah) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER AND REASONS granting #4 Emergency Motion to Remand to State Court for the reasons stated herein. This matter is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/18/2021. (mm) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (mm). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. re #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Trial Transcript, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Jury Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Email to court reporter, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Emails to court reporter, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Email from court reporter, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Email from federal court, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Notice to Parties and State Court Removal)(Cortazzo, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Expedite filed by Willard Masters, III., as to #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2021. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/18/2021.(sbs) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Remand by Willard Masters, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boling, Jeremiah) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Willard Masters, III. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Notice of Submission)(Boling, Jeremiah) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND REASONS - In considering defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.'s #1 notice of removal, the Court orders plaintiff Willard Masters, III, to file any motion to remand by Thursday, NOVEMBER 18, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The Court further orders the parties to participate in a status conference held BY TELEPHONE on NOVEMBER 18, 2021 at noon. The parties shall call in for the teleconference using phone number (877) 873-8018 and access code 4370215. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/17/2021.(sbs) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-03714, F-14 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9111443) filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - First Supp Petition for Damages, #4 Exhibit C - Second Supp Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit D - 11.16.2021 Trial Transcript, #6 Exhibit E - CDC Orleans Parish Docket Sheet)Attorney Thomas J. Cortazzo added to party Graybar Electric Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cortazzo, Thomas) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (lw). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/18/2021) (lw). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avondale Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Burmaster Land and Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CSR AMERICAS, INC. is a litigant