This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 13:30:10 (UTC).

Masters v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Masters filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock, Nina Y. Wang and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01213

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen R Masters

Defendant

Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon Joelle Marino

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Colorado Springs

5536 Library Lane

Colorado Springs, CO 80918

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Cheri R. Lazar

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/23/20. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

23 #2

Proposed Document Proposed Protective Order

23 #1

Appendix A

#23

(#23) Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Protective Order)(Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/11/2020. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#21

(#21) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A proposed Protective Order is due on or before 6/26/2020. Discovery due by 1/10/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/8/2021. FTR: NYW-FTR A502. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

20 #1

Exhibit A

#20

(#20) REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#13

(#17) RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Plaintiff Stephen R Masters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marino, Shannon) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020CV31298. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7275583), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/23/20. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #23 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/23/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Protective Order)(Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/11/2020. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A proposed Protective Order is due on or before 6/26/2020. Discovery due by 1/10/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/8/2021. FTR: NYW-FTR A502. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 Motion to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/10/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) filed by Plaintiff Stephen R Masters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marino, Shannon) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/19/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Joelle Marino on behalf of Stephen R MastersAttorney Shannon Joelle Marino added to party Stephen R Masters(pty:pla) (Marino, Shannon) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1213-NYW (angar, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Allstate on 9 April 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Stephen R Masters.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020CV31298. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7275583), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheri R. Lazar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel