This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 08:53:51 (UTC).

Kali Massey v. Wescom Central Credit Union et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Kali Massey filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Wescom Central Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07622

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kali Massey

Defendants

Wescom Central Credit Union

Does 1 through 5, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Wright

Emily J. Kirk

Richard D. McCune

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew John Demko

Camille A Brooks

Stuart M Richter

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #16 , Notice of Appearance #17 , Notice of Appearance #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wescom Central Credit Union answer now due 12/10/2021, filed by Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union.(Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Camille A Brooks on behalf of Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union (Attorney Camille A Brooks added to party Wescom Central Credit Union(pty:dft))(Brooks, Camille) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew John Demko on behalf of Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union (Attorney Andrew John Demko added to party Wescom Central Credit Union(pty:dft))(Demko, Andrew) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stuart M Richter on behalf of Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union (Attorney Stuart M Richter added to party Wescom Central Credit Union(pty:dft))(Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kali Massey, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kali Massey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32200134) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk

13 #13

Main Document

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit "A" - Opt In Agreement

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #16 , Notice of Appearance #17 , Notice of Appearance #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wescom Central Credit Union answer now due 12/10/2021, filed by Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union.(Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Camille A Brooks on behalf of Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union (Attorney Camille A Brooks added to party Wescom Central Credit Union(pty:dft))(Brooks, Camille) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew John Demko on behalf of Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union (Attorney Andrew John Demko added to party Wescom Central Credit Union(pty:dft))(Demko, Andrew) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stuart M Richter on behalf of Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union (Attorney Stuart M Richter added to party Wescom Central Credit Union(pty:dft))(Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kali Massey, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kali Massey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32200134) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kali Massey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32200134) filed by Plaintiff Kali Massey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk) (Wright, David) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (et) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07622 PA(KSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Emily J. Kirk on behalf of Plaintiff Kali Massey. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I have not received updated certificates of good standing from the State Bars in which I am admitted to practice. Application will be filed as soon as these are received by my office. (lt) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Emily J. Kirk. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wescom Central Credit Union. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kali Massey. (Wright, David) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kali Massey, (Wright, David) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kali Massey. (Wright, David) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32039857 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kali Massey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Opt In Agreement) (Attorney David C. Wright added to party Kali Massey(pty:pla))(Wright, David) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less