This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 08:02:13 (UTC).

Massey v. PNC Bank, National Association et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Massey filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against PNC Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry Edward Autrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Massey

Defendants

PNC Bank, National Association

Taylor Belleville CDJR, Inc.

Oliver C. Joseph, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dillon Clyde Sanders

Attorney at DH SANDERS LLC

8011 Clayton Rd., Third Floor

St. Louis, MO 63117

Donald Henry Sanders, III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DONALD H SANDERS III

8011 Clayton Rd., Third Floor

St. Louis, MO 63117

Defendant Attorneys

John Hein

Attorney at HEIN SCHNEIDER PC

2244 S. Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63144

Grant J. Mabie

Attorney at HEIN SCHNEIDER PC

2244 S. Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63144

Nathan E. Ross

Attorney at HEIN SCHNEIDER PC

2244 S. Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63144

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

20 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

20 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

20 #1

Exhibit Petition

20 #20

Main Document

19 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

19 #19

Main Document

#6

(#8) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Mabie, Grant) filed by PNC Bank, National Association ;ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 14, 2022. PNC Bank, National Association answer due 2/14/2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on January 13, 2022. (MCB) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by John Hein for Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Hein, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#8) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Mabie, Grant) filed by PNC Bank, National Association ;ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 14, 2022. PNC Bank, National Association answer due 2/14/2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on January 13, 2022. (MCB) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. Parent companies: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Publicly held company: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.,. (Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association Sent To: Plaintiff (Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil

1 #1

Exhibit A - State court pleadings and docket

#1

(#19) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Text ORDER: Re #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; Extension to file the following: Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Matthew Massey; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 14, 2022. ( Response to Court due by 3/14/2022.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/2/2022. (HMA) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss ;Extension to file the following: Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss ;Proposed extension date March 14, 2022 by Plaintiff Matthew Massey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Sanders, Donald) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matthew Massey Taylor Belleville CDJR, Inc. waiver signed on 1/20/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Sanders, Dillon) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 Consent MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit set forth in Local Rule 4.01(D) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Ross, Nathan) filed by PNC Bank, National Association ; LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 22, 2022. (MCB) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(Ross, Nathan) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Ross, Nathan) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit set forth in Local Rule 4.01(D) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Ross, Nathan) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Text ORDER: Re #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 21, 2022. (PNC Bank, National Association answer due 2/21/2022). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/11/2022. (HMA) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan E. Ross for Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Ross, Nathan) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Mabie, Grant) filed by PNC Bank, National Association ;ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 14, 2022. PNC Bank, National Association answer due 2/14/2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on January 13, 2022. (MCB) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER RE: MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Proposed Order by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Mabie, Grant) Modified on 1/13/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by John Hein for Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. (Hein, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Matthew Massey.(BAK) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. Parent companies: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Publicly held company: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.,. (Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant PNC Bank, National Association Sent To: Plaintiff (Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 21SL-CC05928, with receipt number AMOEDC-9061647, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court pleadings and docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Mabie, Grant) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Hein(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan Ross