This case was last updated from PACER on 03/03/2020 at 08:12:30 (UTC).

Massey v. Lassiter et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Massey filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Lassiter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Dever, III and Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CT-03006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James C. Dever, III

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quamaine Lee Massey

Tabor City, NC 28463

Defendants

Brad Perritt

North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Division of Adult Cor.

Kenneth E. Lassiter

Todd E. Ishee

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/27/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Document: "Brief" filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) Document: "Remind" - Kenneth Lassiter and Todd Ishee switch spots because Todd Ishee is now the director of Adult Corrections - filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/6/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter to plaintiff regarding filing of complaint and enclosing notice regarding privacy issues. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Grievance

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Todd E. Ishee, Kenneth E. Lassiter, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Division of Adult Cor., Brad Perritt filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachments: #1 Grievance, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II for complaint review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/27/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Document: "Brief" filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Document: "Remind" - Kenneth Lassiter and Todd Ishee switch spots because Todd Ishee is now the director of Adult Corrections - filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (incomplete) by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Richard E. Myers II for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:20-ct-3006-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/7/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/6/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to plaintiff regarding filing of complaint and enclosing notice regarding privacy issues. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Todd E. Ishee, Kenneth E. Lassiter, North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Division of Adult Cor., Brad Perritt filed by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachments: #1 Grievance, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY is a litigant