This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 18:54:14 (UTC).

MASSARO et al v. VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 MASSARO filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01845

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARC MASSARO

BENJAMIN BERNSTEIN

GREG AIKENS

Defendant

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH M. ADAMS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH M ADAMS

200 Highpoint Dr, Suite 211A

Chalfont, PA 18914

MARC E. DANN

Attorney at DANN LAW

2728 Euclid Ave Suite 300

Cleveland, OH 44115

BRIAN D. FLICK

Attorney at DANN LAW

2728 Euclid Ave Suite 300

Cleveland, OH 44115

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL R. BENTZ

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN COURTNEY PC

707 Grant St, Gulf Tower Ste 2600

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

CRAIG J. RENITSKY

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

1617 John F Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1010

Philadelphia, PA 19103

THOMAS M. PIE, JR.

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

707 Grant St Suite 2600

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 26, 2020. ) IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS), E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (er, ). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES TO EXCHANGE RULE 26(A) SELF-EXECUTING DISCLOSURES ON OR BEFORE JUNE 2, 2020, ETC. DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT DISCOVERY. ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 26, 2020, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SHALL SERVE UPON COUNSEL FOR EVERY OTHER PARTY ALL EXPERT REPORTS AND A CURRICULUM VITAE FOR EACH EXPERT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(A)(2)(B), ETC. DEADLINE FOR FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NOT LATER THAN OCTOBER 26, 2020, ETC. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR THIS MATTER WILL BE HELD ON JANUARY 6, 2021, AT 4:00 P.M., AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA, ETC. THIS CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR TRIAL ON JANUARY 11, 2021, OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE SCHEDULE OF THE COURT PERMITS. COURT SHALL BE HELD FROM 9:00 A.M. TO 5:00 P.M. EACH DAY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS) AND E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL BENTZ, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/19/20. 5/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS M. PI JR., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/19/20. 5/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#13

(#13) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Bentz by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14301041.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#12

(#12) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Pie' Jr. by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14301028.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT THE #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/12/20.5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 5/13/2020 (mas, ). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#9

(#11) ORDER THAT THE #9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/12/20.5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, MAY 27, 2020, AT 4:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Velocity Portfolio Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) Modified on 5/5/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG J. RENITSKY on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC with Certificate of Service(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons, Complaint, Initial Procedural Order upon Defendant's Agent by Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested on April 13, 2020 (ADAMS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/10/20. 4/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pa. Dept. of Banking Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14228185.), filed by MARC MASSARO, BENJAMIN BERNSTEIN, GREG AIKENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pa. Dept. of Banking Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ADAMS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY DUE BY 10/26/2020. MOTIONS DUE BY 10/26/2020. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/6/2021 04:00 PM IN Allentown BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 1/11/2021 09:00 AM IN Philadelphia BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.. (er, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 26, 2020. ) IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS), E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (er, ). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES TO EXCHANGE RULE 26(A) SELF-EXECUTING DISCLOSURES ON OR BEFORE JUNE 2, 2020, ETC. DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT DISCOVERY. ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 26, 2020, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SHALL SERVE UPON COUNSEL FOR EVERY OTHER PARTY ALL EXPERT REPORTS AND A CURRICULUM VITAE FOR EACH EXPERT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(A)(2)(B), ETC. DEADLINE FOR FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NOT LATER THAN OCTOBER 26, 2020, ETC. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR THIS MATTER WILL BE HELD ON JANUARY 6, 2021, AT 4:00 P.M., AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA, ETC. THIS CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR TRIAL ON JANUARY 11, 2021, OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE SCHEDULE OF THE COURT PERMITS. COURT SHALL BE HELD FROM 9:00 A.M. TO 5:00 P.M. EACH DAY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS) AND E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 5/27/20. Court Reporter: None. (er, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL BENTZ, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/19/20. 5/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS M. PI JR., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/19/20. 5/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Bentz by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14301041.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Pie' Jr. by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14301028.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT THE #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/12/20.5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 5/13/2020 (mas, ). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT THE #9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/12/20.5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice RE: MARC E. DANN, ESQ. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14288204.) filed by GREG AIKENS, BENJAMIN BERNSTEIN, MARC MASSARO.Certificate of Service.(ADAMS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, MAY 27, 2020, AT 4:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Velocity Portfolio Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) Modified on 5/5/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG J. RENITSKY on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC with Certificate of Service(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons, Complaint, Initial Procedural Order upon Defendant's Agent by Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested on April 13, 2020 (ADAMS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. E-mailed To: JOSEPH M. ADAMS, ESQ. on 4/10/2020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/10/20. 4/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREG AIKENS, BENJAMIN BERNSTEIN, MARC MASSARO. (tjd) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14228185.), filed by MARC MASSARO, BENJAMIN BERNSTEIN, GREG AIKENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pa. Dept. of Banking Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ADAMS, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS M. PIE, JR.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG J. RENITSKY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R. Bentz