This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2021 at 08:30:59 (UTC).

MASSAQUOI v. ZAKEN et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 MASSAQUOI filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against ZAKEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa Pupo Lenihan and W. Scott Hardy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01170

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

Presiding Judge

W. Scott Hardy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANNA MASSAQUOI

Waynesburg, PA 15370

Defendants

MICHAEL ZAKEN

STEPHEN BUZAS

MAUREEN MALANOSKI

KAREN PATTERSON

LESLIE WYNN

J. CARTER

MICHAEL DECARLO

TODD FUNK

H. E. PAWLOWSKI

B. RUDZIENSKI

JAYME GARDNER

GALYNA REICHARDS

WILLIAM NICHOLSON

KOPLOVE

S. WEEDEN

MILLER

A. KRINGER

ROBERT KENNEDY

D. MARTUCCI

122 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Scott A. Bradley

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

26 #1

Envelope

#26

(#26) MOTION for Hearing re #25 Response to Motion filed by MICHAEL ZAKEN, #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION Immediate Permanent Transfer MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MANNA MASSAQUOI by MANNA MASSAQUOI. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

25 #1

Exhibit s A-C

#25

(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION Immediate Permanent Transfer MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MICHAEL ZAKEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-C) (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

23 #1

Envelope

#23

(#23) Correspondence to the Court from MANNA MASSAQUOI (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

22 #1

Envelope

#22

(#22) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#21

(#21) APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by MANNA MASSAQUOI re 13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

5 #1

Envelope

4 #1

Exhibit Authorization Form

#4

(#24) Remark: Certified copies of the (ECF No. #4 ) Order granting Plaintiff's IFP motion and (ECF No. #22 ) Plaintiff's Authorization were mailed to the Inmate Account Officer at S.C.I. Greene. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#2

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion

1 #1

Proposed Order

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Hearing re #25 Response to Motion filed by MICHAEL ZAKEN, #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION Immediate Permanent Transfer MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MANNA MASSAQUOI by MANNA MASSAQUOI. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION Immediate Permanent Transfer MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MICHAEL ZAKEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-C) (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Remark: Certified copies of the (ECF No. #4 ) Order granting Plaintiff's IFP motion and (ECF No. #22 ) Plaintiff's Authorization were mailed to the Inmate Account Officer at S.C.I. Greene. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Correspondence to the Court from MANNA MASSAQUOI (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketJudge W. Scott Hardy presiding and Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan referred. (lar) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer presiding. (lar) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by MANNA MASSAQUOI re 13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Correspondence to the Court from MANNA MASSAQAUOI (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Correspondence to the Court from MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by MANNA MASSAQUOI. Fee $48.33, receipt number 24668071173. (cel) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that a Telephone Conference is scheduled for September 29, 2021 at 3:00 PM. All participants shall call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. Defense counsel shall make arrangements for the Plaintiff to participate. All parties should be prepared to discuss the (ECF No. #7 ) Motion for Immediate Permanent Injunction, Immediate Permanent Transfer, Appointment of Counsel & Etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/17/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of MICHAEL ZAKEN. (Bradley, Scott) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Immediate Permanent Injunction, MOTION Immediate Permanent Transfer, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that(ECF No. #2 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/03/2021. (jmb) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against R. ADAMSON, E. ALLEN, J. E. ANDERSON, J. ANGEL, B. ANGELO, J. ANKROM, J. ARDABELL, A. BOLIONIS, BOWSER, N. L. BRANT, BRAUNLISH, W. BRUDA, STEPHEN BUZAS, J. CARTER, J. CARUSO, E. CHIPPS, R. CHRISTOPHER, D. E. CLECKLEY, T. COLE, E. R. COLLINS, COULEHAN, COY, D. CURCID, S. DAVIS, MICHAEL DECARLO, MARK DIALESANDRO, JASON A. DICK, D. DIVEN, B. EDBY, P. ESTLE, FERGUSON, M. FIKE, TODD FUNK, J. GAGNON, JAYME GARDNER, DEAN GEEHRING, MICHAEL GERBER, T. GILLSPIE, ROBERT GILMORE, GORDEN, A. GOULD, CRYSTAL GREENAWALT, Z. M. GREENAWALT, J. GRIM, ANTHONY GUMBAREVIC, MICHAEL GUYTON, J. HAGETER, J. HAINES, R. HASSETT, D. K. HENDERSON, MICHAEL HICKS, ERIC HINTEMEYER, HOLLOWOOD, D. HONSAKER, A. HOOVER, HORN, M. HUEY, J. IMHOFF, INGRAM, JALLOT, J. JOHN, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, M. JOHNSON, B. JONES, J. JONES, T. JONES, J. KARPENCY, ROBERT KENNEDY, KOPLOVE, A. KRINGER, A. KULIK, KUTER, M. KUZMA, FRANK LARGENT, LECKEY, E. LEECH, N. LEICHLITER, C. LEWIS, K. LITTON, B. LYNCH, MAUREEN MALANOSKI, MARTIN, D. MARTUCCI, G. R. MCCLURE, ROBERT MCCOMBIE, J. E. MCLEAN, S. MEADOW, MILLER, S. MILLIKEN, S. NAPOLEAN, WILLIAM NICHOLSON, NORRIS, ONDERKO, ORBASH, MICHAEL PALMER, KAREN PATTERSON, T. PAULEY, H. E. PAWLOWSKI, S. PEARCE, A. PLAXI, R. POLYBLANK, PRICE, D. A. PRICE, J. REHONIC, GALYNA REICHARDS, D. REYNOLD, J. ROGERS, B. RUDZIENSKI, RICK SAM, SANTO, V. SANTOYO, COURTNEY L. SCHEDIKA, D. A. SCHULTZ, TRACEY SHANLEY, T. SKIEBIEL, C. SMITH, J. STABILE, C. STANDARD, STEELE, BARKEFELT SWITZER, T. C. TEAGARDEN, D. THOMAS, TIKEY, N. TRAUX, F. TROUT, B. ULIZIO, A. VASHINESKI, T. WALLACE, S. WEEDEN, C. WELD, J. WERKMAN, P. WOODS, A. WOZNY, LESLIE WYNN, J. YANDIVNER, MICHAEL ZAKEN (IFP Granted), filed by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire $350.00 filing fee. However, Plaintiff shall pay $48.33 as an initial partial filing fee as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order, the initial partial filing fee to the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after the payment of the initial partial filing fee, each time a deposit is made to Plaintiff's account, the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall set aside the deposit immediately before any disbursement is made by Plaintiff, and when the amount in Plaintiff's account exceeds $10.00, the agency shall forward payments to this Court equaling 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his account until the filing fee for this case is paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is binding on the superintendent/warden of any jail or correctional facility where Plaintiff is incarcerated until the filing fee is paid in full in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enclose with this Order an authorization form which Plaintiff shall complete and return to the Court within TEN (10) DAYS of entry of this Order. On this form, Plaintiff shall sign either the section that authorizes monthly payments from his inmate account or the section that moves to withdraw this action without payment of any portion of the filing fee, assuming Plaintiff no longer wishes to proceed with this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Inmate Account Officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement if and once Plaintiff has returned his authorization form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute if Plaintiff fails to return the authorization form within TEN (10) DAYS from the date of this Order or if Plaintiff authorizes payments and the initial partial filing fee is not received within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court docket the Complaint and any attachments thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on September 2, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Authorization Form) (kcb) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (cel) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MANNA MASSAQUOI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #3 Envelope) (cel) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLER (B) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Bradley Esq.