This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2020 at 08:48:43 (UTC).

Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10383

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association

Defendant

Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael P Guagenty

Attorney at Sloane & Walsh LLP

Three Center Plaza

Boston, MA 02108

Brett R. Corson

Attorney at Sloane & Walsh

Three Center Plaza

Boston, MA 02108

Defendant Attorneys

Rene M. Pickett

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Jonathan F. Tabasky

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Jordan L. Schwindt

Attorney at Hamel, Marcin, Dunn, Reardon & Shea, P.C.

350 Lincoln Street, Suite 1101

Hingham, MA 02043

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2021; Motions for summary judgment due by 8/31/2021; Ready for Trial on 11/1/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#11

(#11) JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 with cert. of service by Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association.(Corson, Brett) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#6

(#6) STATE COURT Record Electrolux Home Products, Inc. summons served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.. (Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Tabasky on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Tabasky, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett R. Corson on behalf of Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association (Corson, Brett) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

1 #3

Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8125156 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2021; Motions for summary judgment due by 8/31/2021; Ready for Trial on 11/1/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. i>In light of the recent developments with the COVID-19 pandemic, the scheduling conference set for April 13, 2020 at 3:00 PM is canceled. A case management scheduling order will issue. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 with cert. of service by Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association.(Corson, Brett) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT Record Electrolux Home Products, Inc. summons served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.. (Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Tabasky on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Tabasky, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett R. Corson on behalf of Massachusetts Property Insurance Underwriting Association (Corson, Brett) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#3) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8125156 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan L. Schwindt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rene M. Pickett