This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 09:40:54 (UTC).

Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Prime Bank et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Prime Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00808

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Kelly Clift

Prime Bank

Prime Business Solutions

Kevin Ryan

Karen Ryan

Janet Barrett

Kelly Johns

Brian Sasser

Timothy Richards Johns

Shelly Lynn Nye

Michelle Lea Cordray

Melissa Kay Cordray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew M Bowman

Attorney at Foliart Huff Ottaway & Bottom

201 Robert S Kerr Ave, 12Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Michelle Lea Cordray served on 9/8/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Melissa Kay Cordray served on 8/28/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Timothy Richards Johns served on 8/31/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Kevin Ryan served on 8/29/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Kelly Clift served on 8/28/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Karen Ryan served on 8/29/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Brian Sasser served on 8/27/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Prime Bank. Prime Bank waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Janet Barrett, Kelly Clift, Melissa Kay Cordray, Michelle Lea Cordray, Timothy Richards Johns, Shelly Lynn Nye, Karen Ryan, Kevin Ryan, Brian Sasser. (kmt) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Bowman on behalf of Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit 15 - Barrett Claim Form Redacted

1 #11

Exhibit 11 - Prime Bank Assignment

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Correspondence

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Correspondence

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Correspondence

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Policy Loan History

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Policy Redacted

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Michelle Lea Cordray served on 9/8/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Melissa Kay Cordray served on 8/28/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Timothy Richards Johns served on 8/31/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Kevin Ryan served on 8/29/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Kelly Clift served on 8/28/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Karen Ryan served on 8/29/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Brian Sasser served on 8/27/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Prime Bank. Prime Bank waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Janet Barrett, Kelly Clift, Melissa Kay Cordray, Michelle Lea Cordray, Timothy Richards Johns, Shelly Lynn Nye, Karen Ryan, Kevin Ryan, Brian Sasser. (kmt) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Bowman on behalf of Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3742734. (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Janet Barrett, Kelly Clift, Melissa Kay Cordray, Michelle Lea Cordray, Timothy Richards Johns, Shelly Lynn Nye, Prime Bank, Prime Business Solutions, Karen Ryan, Kevin Ryan, Brian Sasser filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Policy Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ryan Assignment Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Policy Loan History, #4 Exhibit 4 - Beneficiary Designation Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Beneficiary Designation Redacted, #6 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7 - Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8 - Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 9 - Barrett Subordination Agreement, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ryan Subordination Agreement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Prime Bank Assignment, #12 Exhibit 12 - Death Certificate Redacted, #13 Exhibit 13 - Correspondence, #14 Exhibit 14 - Prime Bank Claim Form, #15 Exhibit 15 - Barrett Claim Form Redacted, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASSACHUSETTS MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew M Bowman