This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2023 at 13:24:13 (UTC).

Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Hamar

Case Summary

On September 14, 2021, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (“MassMutual” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Katherine Leigh Villanueva of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, filed an iInsurance lawsuit against Laszlo Hamar (“Defendant”). Plaintiff filed suit seeking declaratory relief along with damages, prejudgment and post judgment interest, and costs of suit for Defendant’s alleged practice to make Plaintiff act upon his knowingly and intentionally made material misstatements of fact and failure to accurately, honestly, and/or truthfully answer and disclose material information on the application for the policies. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of New York. 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “In September 2017, August 2018, and September 2018, MassMutual issued four life insurance policies, each with a waiver of premium rider to Defendant. The waiver of premium rider obviates the requirement that Defendant pay a premium on his life insurance policy in the event of total disability – i.e., in the event that a sickness or injury rendered Defendant unable to perform the main duties of his occupation as a New York Police Officer.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “After Defendant submitted a claim for waived premiums under the policies, MassMutual discovered purposeful, fraudulent, and material misrepresentations in the application for the policies. Specifically, MassMutual discovered that Defendant purposefully failed to disclose, inter alia, that he was treated for injuries to his shoulder, back, neck, head and diagnosed with head trauma with post concussive syndrome, vestibular dysfunction, dizziness, blurry vision, headaches and other injures, approximately four years before he completed the application for the policies.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Had Defendant provided complete and accurate responses to the application questions, MassMutual would not have approved the issuance of the waiver of premium riders that accompany the life insurance policies. In light of Defendant’s material misrepresentations, MassMutual seeks a determination from the Court that the Waiver of Premium Riders are void and properly rescinded.”

The only claim for relief laid down by Plaintiff is for the declaratory judgment, wherein, Plaintiff alleged that, Defendant knowingly and intentionally made material misstatements of fact and otherwise failed to accurately, honestly, and/or truthfully answer and disclose material information on the application for the policies. Allegedly, had MassMutual known of Defendant’s misstatements, misrepresentations, and omissions at the time of application, it would not have issued the polices. Allegedly due to Defendant’s fraudulent, purposeful, and material misrepresentations on the application, Defendant is not entitled to the Policies’ Waiver of Premium Riders. Instead, the policies are void ab initio and properly rescinded, and no benefits are payable thereunder.

In its prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court to declare that the Waiver of Premium Riders are rescinded, that no insurance under the policies ever took effect and the policies are void ab initio, and that benefits are not payable under the policies. Plaintiff further requested for awarding damages, prejudgment interest, post judgment interest, costs of suit, reasonable attorneys’ fees, and such other relief as the court deems equitable and just.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05108

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Laszio Hamar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine Leigh Villanueva

Nolan Tully

 

Court Documents

5 #1

RETURN OF SERVICE

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Attachments: #1 RETURN OF SERVICE) (Tully, Nolan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Laszio Hamar filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14836193 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons) (Villanueva, Katherine) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Case closed. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/28/2021. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Laszio Hamar. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Tully on behalf of Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tully, Nolan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Case closed. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/28/2021. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Attachments: #1 RETURN OF SERVICE) (Tully, Nolan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Laszio Hamar. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Tully on behalf of Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tully, Nolan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Laszio Hamar filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14836193 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons) (Villanueva, Katherine) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less