This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 08:12:51 (UTC).

Maspeth Music BV v. Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Maspeth Music BV filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04095

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maspeth Music BV

Defendant

Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Caplan

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt LLP

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floorste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Brett Van Benthysen

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt LLP

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floorste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties as follows: The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to July 16, 2021. SO ORDERED., Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc. answer due 7/16/2021. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/4/2021) (rj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to REPUBLIC RECORDS, a division of UMG RECORDINGS, INC., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian D. Caplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294 Breach of Contract. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contact. (gp) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Van Benthysen on behalf of Maspeth Music BV..(Van Benthysen, Brett) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24506416)Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Caplan, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Republic Records, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Van Benthysen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Caplan