This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2021 at 09:00:01 (UTC).

Mary Kay Inc v. Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Mary Kay Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www ebay com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01074

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Doe 1-10

Mary Kay Inc

Defendants

Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com

John Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kent Allen Britt

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

301 East Fourth Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Christopher J Schwegmann

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Hurst & Schwegmann LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Subpoena to eBay

3 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Subpoena to PayPal

3 #3

Exhibit C - Proposed Order

#4

#5

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff Mary Kay's Motion For Leave to Serve Limited Third Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to Identify John Doe Defendants [Dkt. No. #3 ]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/7/2021) (mcrd) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC Order Referring #3 MOTION For Leave to Serve Limited Third Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to Identify John Doe Defendants to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for determination. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/18/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ygl) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION For Leave to Serve Limited Third Party Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to Identify John Doe Defendants filed by Mary Kay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Subpoena to eBay, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Subpoena to PayPal, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Britt, Kent) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Kay Inc. (Britt, Kent) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beyou-Cosmetics Storefront on www.ebay.com, John Doe 1-10 filed by Mary Kay Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11886664) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Britt, Kent) Modified on 5/13/2021 to include payment information(ygl). (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mary Kay Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent Allen Britt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J Schwegmann