This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 09:07:31 (UTC).

Mary Ann James de Holguin

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Mary Ann James de Holguin was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edwin G. Torres and Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-23410

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendants

Rubio Pilar

Shutts & Bowen LLP

1500 Miami Center, 201 S. Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

In Re

Mary Ann James de Holguin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jamie B Wasserman

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

525 Okeechobee Blvd., Cityplace Tower Suite 1100

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Steven Michael Ebner

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

In Re Attorneys

Adolfo Enrique Jimenez

Attorney at Holland & Knight

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Joshua Royas Levenson

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

515 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Exhibit A

#22

(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Cross MOTION to Compel Applicant and her Counsel to Produce Communications Between Decedent and Respondents, and for Sanctions, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levenson, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jimenez, Adolfo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

20 #4

Exhibit D - Prenuptial Agreement

20 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Diego Suarez

20 #2

Exhibit B - Email chain between counsel

20 #1

Exhibit A - Counter-Petition

#20

(#20) Cross MOTION to Compel Applicant and her Counsel to Produce Communications Between Decedent and Respondents, and for Sanctions, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. Responses due by 10/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counter-Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Email chain between counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Diego Suarez, #4 Exhibit D - Prenuptial Agreement)(Wasserman, Jamie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

19 #4

Exhibit D - Prenuptial Agreement

19 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Diego Suarez

19 #2

Exhibit B - Email chain between counsel

19 #1

Exhibit A - Counter Petition

#19

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time filed by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counter Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Email chain between counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Diego Suarez, #4 Exhibit D - Prenuptial Agreement)(Wasserman, Jamie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer , First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time by Mary Ann James de Holguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Adolfo) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#12

(#13) ORDER REFERRING #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres to be heard and determined, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Cross MOTION to Compel Applicant and her Counsel to Produce Communications Between Decedent and Respondents, and for Sanctions, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levenson, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jimenez, Adolfo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Cross MOTION to Compel Applicant and her Counsel to Produce Communications Between Decedent and Respondents, and for Sanctions, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. Responses due by 10/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counter-Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Email chain between counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Diego Suarez, #4 Exhibit D - Prenuptial Agreement)(Wasserman, Jamie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time filed by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counter Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Email chain between counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Diego Suarez, #4 Exhibit D - Prenuptial Agreement)(Wasserman, Jamie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory,, Spurious Allegations and Impose Sanctions Against Applicant and Her Counsel and Award Respondents their Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email chain between counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Diego Suarez, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Prenuptial Agreement - Colombian, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Mary Ann James Certificate of Disposition of marriage, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Prenuptial Agreement Outside of Colombia, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - NY Cert of Marriage Registration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Counter-Petition, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Statement of Claims by Mary Ann James de Holguin)(Wasserman, Jamie) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory,, Spurious Allegations and Impose Sanctions filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levenson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REFERRING #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to #11 Response/Reply (Other), by Mary Ann James de Holguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bermudez Decl.)(Levenson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer , First MOTION leave to file under seal, in camera review, and extension of time by Mary Ann James de Holguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Adolfo) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres to be heard and determined, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordinarily, this stage of the process under 28 U.S.C. s 1782 can be adjudicated on an ex parte basis. Any relief on the application would allow a Rule 45 subpoena to be issued and appropriate objections and responses could then be served by any objecting party. In this case, the interested objecting party is seeking to be heard prior to a subpoena being issued, in part on the argument that there is no pending judicial proceeding in a foreign jurisdiction sufficient to trigger section 1782. Additionally, the interested party is asserting duplication of remedies based on pending probate matters in this jurisdiction.Accordingly, the Court will grant the request for an extension of time to respond to the application for any interested party, but only through 9/9/2020. But any such response, to the extent it is based on claims of attorney client privilege, must include a properly prepared privilege log as required by Local Rule 26.1. Failure to include any responsive documents, that are identified in the application, in the privilege log may be deemed a waiver of the claim of privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/26/2020. (EGT) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time 30 days to file Comprehensive Response in opposition re #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory,, filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. Replies due by 9/1/2020. (Jimenez, Adolfo) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge re #5 NOTICE by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP re 1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory ; 6 MOTION for Extension of Time. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (mr1). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice (Other),. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk; See DE 6 . It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (lk) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time 30 days to file Comprehensive Response in opposition re #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory,, by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. Responses due by 9/3/2020 See image at DE #5 (lk) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP re #1 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory,, Notice of Objection and Request for Thirty Days to File Comprehensive Response in Opposition to Application. Attorney Jamie B Wasserman added to party Rubio Pilar(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie B Wasserman added to party Shutts & Bowen LLP(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Administration) (Wasserman, Jamie) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Michael Ebner on behalf of Rubio Pilar, Shutts & Bowen LLP. Attorney Steven Michael Ebner added to party Rubio Pilar(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Michael Ebner added to party Shutts & Bowen LLP(pty:dft). (Ebner, Steven) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Order Referring Application to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Judicial Assistance for Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 for Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13362511, filed by Mary Ann James de Holguin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A of Application for Discovery, #3 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit 1 of Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 2 of Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 3 of Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 4 of Memorandum, #8 Exhibit 5 of Memorandum, #9 Exhibit 6 of Memorandum, #10 Exhibit 7 of Memorandum, #11 Exhibit 8 of Memorandum)(Jimenez, Adolfo) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less