This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:47:45 (UTC).

Marx et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Marx filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Norcold, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Traci Marx

Ray Marx

Alyssa Dillard

Seth Dillard

Defendants

THETFORD CORPORATION

Norcold, Inc

The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation

Camping World Holdings, Inc

Camping World, Inc

CWI, Inc.

Camping World of Henderson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald H. Williams

Drew J. Starbuck

John T. Keating

Terrence A. Beard

Defendant Attorneys

Michael R. Smith

Steven B Abbott

Martin J. Kravitz

Michael R Esposito

Russell S. Ponessa

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) Amended Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#28

(#28) REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Plaintiffs Alyssa Dillard, Seth Dillard, Ray Marx, Traci Marx. (Beard, Terrence) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#26

(#26) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #25 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/23/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#25

(#25) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#23

(#23) Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Abbott, Steven) Modified on 2/22/2022 (SLD). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

22 #1

Exhibit

#22

(#22) RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. Replies due by 2/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#13

(#22) RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. Replies due by 2/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by THETFORD CORPORATION. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NORCOLD, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Thetford Corporation.(Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2022 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Terrence Beard; Def Counsel: Michael Smith, telephonic appearance; Russell Ponessa and Michael Esposito; Recording start and end times: 11:01a.m. - 11:56a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; Due to technical difficulties, Michael Smith, Esq., appeared telephonically. All other parties appeared via Zoom. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to #29 Amended Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order.The Court sets forth its findings on the record and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART #29 Amended Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The transcript of these proceedings will serve as the Court's Order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/25/2022. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.RE: Proposed Amended Discovery Plan (ECF No. 29). Hearing set for Monday, March 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. via the Zoom video conference platform. The parties shall contact Elvia Garcia, Courtroom Deputy for the undersigned Magistrate Judge, by 12:00 p.m. on March 10, 2022, at Elvia_Garcia@nvd.uscourts.gov, and provide the email addresses of their respective participants. The courtroom deputy shall email all participants with the Zoom link. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that persons granted with remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary to the Court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) Amended Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Plaintiffs Alyssa Dillard, Seth Dillard, Ray Marx, Traci Marx. (Beard, Terrence) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

Docket(#27) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #25 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/23/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #23 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Steven Abbott. For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #23 as a Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order using the same PDF image and the appropriate document event to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing a separate document for each request or purpose. Do not refile the Joint Status Report. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Abbott, Steven) Modified on 2/22/2022 (SLD). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Defendants Norcold, Inc, The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. Replies due by 2/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Thetford Corporation.(Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Norcold, Inc.(Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/11/2022.(Abbott, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/19/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Kelly Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/3/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022

Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Terrence A. Beard to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/2/2022. (no image attached) (KF) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022

DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (KF) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by THETFORD CORPORATION. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NORCOLD, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada District Court, Case Number A-21-845364-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6763993) by THETFORD CORPORATION, NORCOLD, INC., Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbott, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less