This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 11:11:06 (UTC).

Marvin Vernis Smith v. Marcus Pollard

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Marvin Vernis Smith filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Marcus Pollard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01550

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marvin Vernis Smith

San Diego, CA 92179

Respondent

Marcus Pollard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia

Attorney at CAAG - Office of Attorney General

600 West Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners memorandum is due by or before December 11, 2020. (See Minute Order for further details) granting #5 MOTION for Extension (vm) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum filed by petitioner Marvin Vernis Smith. (vm) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia on behalf of Respondent Marcus Pollard (Attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia added to party Marcus Pollard(pty:res))(Chenelia, Kristen) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

3 #1

Petition

#3

(#3) ORDER RE: REVIEW OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. It is ORDERED that Petitioner will file a memorandum by or before October 2, 2020, not to exceed 5 pages showing good cause why the case should not be dismissed. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (vm) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Marcus Pollard. (lh) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners memorandum is due by or before December 11, 2020. (See Minute Order for further details) granting #5 MOTION for Extension (vm) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum filed by petitioner Marvin Vernis Smith. (vm) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia on behalf of Respondent Marcus Pollard (Attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia added to party Marcus Pollard(pty:res))(Chenelia, Kristen) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER RE: REVIEW OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. It is ORDERED that Petitioner will file a memorandum by or before October 2, 2020, not to exceed 5 pages showing good cause why the case should not be dismissed. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (vm) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Marcus Pollard. (lh) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less