This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2022 at 09:19:52 (UTC).

Marvin v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Marvin filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Johnson Johnson Consumer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gail Marvin

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.

Allen Marine Tours, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric A. Auten

Attorney at Law Office of Eric Auten

P. O. Box 2717

Valdez, AK 99686

Defendant Attorneys

Michael B. Hewes

Attorney at Bulter Snow

1300 25Th Avenue, Suite 204, Butler Snow Llp

Gulfport, MS 39501

Rebecca A. Lindemann

Attorney at Richmond & Quinn

360 K Street, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

Kimberlee A. Colbo

Attorney at Hughes White Colbo & Tervooren, LLC

4241 B Street, Suite 202

Anchorage, AK 99503

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Allen Marine Tours, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's Claims Against It Pursuant to the Alaska Workers' Compensation Exclusive Remedy Bar by Allen Marine Tours, Inc..(Colbo, Kimberlee) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gail Marvin. (Auten, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#14

(#14) Receipt of 250.00 non-resident attorney payment for Michael B. Hewes as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Hewes (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Hewes by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. answer due 6/23/2022. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/22/22. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #14

2022 (05) May 24 Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear and Participate

8 #13

2022 (05) May 24 Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.'s Rule 12(B)(6) Motion t

8 #10

2022 (04) Apr 14 Answer to Complaint - Colbo, Kimberlee

8 #8

2022 (04) Apr 12 Entry of Appearance Attorney Information - Attorney Monkman, R

8 #6

2022 (03) Mar 30 Civil Rule 4(f) Affidavit - Allen Marine Tours, SEARCH and Bra

8 #5

2022 (02) Feb 28 Notice of Dismissal for Failure to Serve Defendant

8 #4

2022 (02) Feb 16 Judicial Reassignments

8 #8

Main Document

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America.(Scheperle, Marie) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#19) JWS TEXT ORDER: The order at docket 17 dismissed claims against the United States of America. It has no effect on claims against other defendants. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Allen Marine Tours, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's Claims Against It Pursuant to the Alaska Workers' Compensation Exclusive Remedy Bar by Allen Marine Tours, Inc..(Colbo, Kimberlee) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JWS TEXT ORDER: The motion at docket #6 is GRANTED. This case is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gail Marvin. (Auten, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael B. Hewes, at docket #13 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Receipt of 250.00 non-resident attorney payment for Michael B. Hewes as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Hewes (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Hewes by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. answer due 6/23/2022. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/22/22. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s),,,,,, TO PLAINT5IFF'S COMPLAINT (UNOPPOSED) by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindemann, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 2021 (08) Aug 10 Summons and Notice to Both Parties of Judicial Assignment, #2 2021 (08) Aug 10 Entry of Appearance Attorney Information - Attorney Auten, Eric A, #3 2021 (09) Sept 15 Complaint for Product Liability, #4 2022 (02) Feb 16 Judicial Reassignments, #5 2022 (02) Feb 28 Notice of Dismissal for Failure to Serve Defendant, #6 2022 (03) Mar 30 Civil Rule 4(f) Affidavit - Allen Marine Tours, SEARCH and Bradelle Padon, #7 2022 (04) Apr 07 Civil Rule 4(f) Affidavit - J&J Consumer, Inc, #8 2022 (04) Apr 12 Entry of Appearance Attorney Information - Attorney Monkman, Richard D and Cesar, Kendri M M, #9 2022 (04) Apr 14 Entry of Appearance - Colbo, Kimberlee, #10 2022 (04) Apr 14 Answer to Complaint - Colbo, Kimberlee, #11 2022 (04) Apr 14 Demand for Jury Trial, #12 2022 (05) May 03 Order of Dismissal for Failure to Serve Defendant, #13 2022 (05) May 24 Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.'s Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss, #14 2022 (05) May 24 Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear and Participate - Taylor B. Mayes, #15 2022 (05) May 24 Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear and Participate - Andrew D. Tharp, #16 2022 (05) May 25 Order Granting Motion Case Motion #2, #17 2022 (05) May 25 Order Granting Motion Case Motion #3, #18 2022 (05) May 26 Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear and Participate - Michael B. Hewes, #19 2022 (05) May 31 Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Scheperle, Marie) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Meredith Torres re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Scheperle, Marie) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America.(Scheperle, Marie) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by United States of America (Scheperle, Marie) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Case Caption) (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Superior Court for the State of Aaska, First Judicial District at Juneau, case number 1JU-21-00762CI., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca A. Lindemann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael B. Hewes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberlee A. Colbo