This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 14:07:31 (UTC).

Marvin et al v. Sheriff of Orange County et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Marvin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Sheriff of Orange County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip M. Halpern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-03464

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip M. Halpern

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Mark Marvin

Walden, NY 12586

Rose Marvin

Walden, NY 12586

Respondents

Orange County New York Department of Social Services

Sheriff of Orange County

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: Petitioner Mark Marvin is directed to file a declaration within sixty days of the date of this order showing why the petition should not be denied. A declaration form is attached to this order. If Petitioner timely files a declaration, the Court will review it, and if proper, will order the Respondent to answer. If Petitioner fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the petition will be denied. No answer will be required at this time. The Court dismisses from the proceeding Petitioner Rose Marvin because she is not "in custody." 28 U.S.C. 2254(a). Because Petitioners have not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). In light of the current global health crisis, parties proceeding pro se are encouraged to submit all filings by email to Temporary_Pro_Se_Filing@nysd.uscourts.gov. Pro se parties also are encouraged to consent to receive all court documents electronically. A consent to electronic service form is available on the Courts website. Pro se parties who are unable to use email may submit documents by regular mail or in person at the drop box located at the U.S. Courthouses in Manhattan (500 Pearl Street) and White Plains (300 Quarropas Street). For more information, including instructions on this new email service for pro se parties, please visit the Court's website at nysd.uscourts.gov. A copy of this Order and attached declaration form is being mailed by Chambers to Petitioners. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/13/2020) Rose Marvin terminated. (ks) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Filing Fee $5.00 Paid). Document filed by Mark Marvin, Rose Marvin. (sac) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Petitioner Mark Marvin is directed to file a declaration within sixty days of the date of this order showing why the petition should not be denied. A declaration form is attached to this order. If Petitioner timely files a declaration, the Court will review it, and if proper, will order the Respondent to answer. If Petitioner fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the petition will be denied. No answer will be required at this time. The Court dismisses from the proceeding Petitioner Rose Marvin because she is not "in custody." 28 U.S.C. 2254(a). Because Petitioners have not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). In light of the current global health crisis, parties proceeding pro se are encouraged to submit all filings by email to Temporary_Pro_Se_Filing@nysd.uscourts.gov. Pro se parties also are encouraged to consent to receive all court documents electronically. A consent to electronic service form is available on the Courts website. Pro se parties who are unable to use email may submit documents by regular mail or in person at the drop box located at the U.S. Courthouses in Manhattan (500 Pearl Street) and White Plains (300 Quarropas Street). For more information, including instructions on this new email service for pro se parties, please visit the Court's website at nysd.uscourts.gov. A copy of this Order and attached declaration form is being mailed by Chambers to Petitioners. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/13/2020) Rose Marvin terminated. (ks) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketPro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $5.00 Money Order processed by the Finance Department on 4/30/2020, Receipt Number 465401258398. (vf) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Filing Fee $5.00 Paid). Document filed by Mark Marvin, Rose Marvin. (sac) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County New York Department of Health is a litigant

Latest cases where SHERIFF OF ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant