This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 08:04:01 (UTC).

Martinson v. Liberty County Jail et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Martinson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Liberty County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Geno Martinson

Burlington, KY 41005

Defendants

Liberty County Jail

Liberty Correctional Medicine

Sascha Krumnow

McEedy

Barnes

Martinez

Walthour

Barber

Will

Wise

Cox

Hatfield

Savoy

Reid

James

Dabson

William Bowman

Dixon

Killdo

10 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Geno Martinson. (csr) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Geno Martinson. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (csr) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Geno Martinson. (csr) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter from Anthony Geno Martinson. (jlh) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

PLRA forms

#6

(#6) CONSENT by Prisoner Anthony Geno Martinson to collection of fees. (ca) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony Geno Martinson. (Attachments: #1 Account Summary) (gmh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2022: #2 Corrected pdf, #3 Corrected Attachment) (gmh). (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT by Prisoner Anthony Geno Martinson to collection of fees. (ca) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 3/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 PLRA forms) (ca) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Anthony Geno Martinson. (jlh) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Geno Martinson. (csr) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Geno Martinson. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (csr) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Geno Martinson. (csr) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hatfield is a litigant

Latest cases where . Reid is a litigant

Latest cases where WISE is a litigant

Latest cases where BARBER is a litigant