This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 08:06:13 (UTC).

MARTINEZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 MARTINEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03708

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILBERT M. MARTINEZ

Reading, PA 19606

Defendants

HON. CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY

HON. MICHEAL A. CHAGARES

HON. JAMES KNOLL GARDNER

HON. ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

HON. DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON

HON. EDWARD G. SMITH

HON. ROSEMARY S. POOLER

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Designation Form Case Management Track Form

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, ROSEMARY S. POOLER, EDWARD G. SMITH, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by GILBERT M. MARTINEZ.(DT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded by Pro Se Plaintiff Gilbert M. Martinez against MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, ROSEMARY S. POOLER, EDWARD G. SMITH, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form Case Management Track Form)(DT) Modified on 8/19/2019 (dt, ).(envelope attached) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF 9/17/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) AND MOTION TO RECUSE (ECF NO. 6) IT IS ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN IFP IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME SO THAT THE COURT MAY SCREEN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, WHICH IS NOW THE OPERATIVE PLEADING IN THIS MATTER, IN DUE COURSE. MARTINEZ'S PENDING MOTIONS WILL ALSO BE HANDLED IN DUE COURSE. TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4M IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS FOLLOWING ANY DECISION BY THE COURT THAT THE CLAIMS IN THIS CASE SHOULD PROCEED. THE MOTION TO RECUSE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/17/2019. 9/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (DT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION TO RECUSE, FILED BY GILBERT M. MARTINEZ.(amas) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF 9/17/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) AND MOTION TO RECUSE (ECF NO. 6) IT IS ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN IFP IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME SO THAT THE COURT MAY SCREEN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, WHICH IS NOW THE OPERATIVE PLEADING IN THIS MATTER, IN DUE COURSE. MARTINEZ'S PENDING MOTIONS WILL ALSO BE HANDLED IN DUE COURSE. TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4M IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS FOLLOWING ANY DECISION BY THE COURT THAT THE CLAIMS IN THIS CASE SHOULD PROCEED. THE MOTION TO RECUSE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/17/2019. 9/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (DT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION TO RECUSE, FILED BY GILBERT M. MARTINEZ.(amas) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, ROSEMARY S. POOLER, EDWARD G. SMITH, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by GILBERT M. MARTINEZ.(DT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Jury Trial Demanded by Pro Se Plaintiff GILBERT M. MARTINEZ. (DT) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded by Pro Se Plaintiff Gilbert M. Martinez against MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, ROSEMARY S. POOLER, EDWARD G. SMITH, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form Case Management Track Form)(DT) Modified on 8/19/2019 (dt, ).(envelope attached) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (DT) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.