This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:49:12 (UTC).

Martinez v. Nguyen

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nguyen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02882

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olga Martinez

Defendant

Bien Van Nguyen

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Eric Lopez

Attorney at R E Lopez & Associates PC

550 E 15Th Street, Suite 200

Plano, TX 75074

Kory Kingery

Attorney at R.E. Lopez & Associates

550 E. 15Th Street, Suite 200

Plano, TX 75074

Daniel Morales

Attorney at R E Lopez & Associates PC

2600 K Avenue, Suite 140

Plano, TX 75074

Defendant Attorneys

Ron T Capehart

Attorney at The Bassett Firm

3838 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75219

Mike H Bassett

Attorney at The Bassett Firm

3838 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75219

Catherine Schraegle

Attorney at The Berry Firm

1412 Main Street, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75202

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Lexa Auld

Attorney at Law Office of Lexa Anne Auld

1704 Windsor Forest Trial

Roanoke, TX 76262

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 193rd District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-08306 filed by Bien Van Nguyen. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10457868) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Capehart, Ron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10478359) filed by Olga Martinez (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Good Standing Letter) (Kingery, Kory) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#11

(#11) Mail returned as undeliverable. #9 Order Referring Case to ADR, received back from Lexa Auld as Return to Sender- Insufficient Address- Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ykp) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/9/2019) (epm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Lexa Auld as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/20/2019) (axm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

5 #1

Additional Page(s) Good Standing Letter

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 3/8/2021 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 5/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2020. Motions due by 11/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/26/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/20/2019) (axm) Modified on 12/23/2019 (axm). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bien Van Nguyen. (Capehart, Ron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Mail returned as undeliverable. #9 Order Referring Case to ADR, received back from Lexa Auld as Return to Sender- Insufficient Address- Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ykp) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Mon Dec 23 14:10:28 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 3/8/2021 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 5/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2020. Motions due by 11/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/26/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/20/2019) (axm) Modified on 12/23/2019 (axm). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Lexa Auld as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/20/2019) (axm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kory Kingery; Defense - Ron Capehart. (Court Reporter: Tutti Bui) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :12. (chmb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER: *TIME CHANGE ONLY* The Court reschedules the FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference for 12/19/2019 at 04:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/17/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants [ECF No. 5] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kory Kingery ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/16/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10478359) filed by Olga Martinez (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Good Standing Letter) (Kingery, Kory) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/9/2019) (epm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bien Van Nguyen. (Capehart, Ron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 193rd District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-08306 filed by Bien Van Nguyen. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10457868) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Capehart, Ron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.