This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 07:14:48 (UTC).

Martinez v. Lagos

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Martinez against Lagos in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11931

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George A. OToole, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claudia Martinez

Defendant

Jesus P Lagos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miryam E. Cissero

Attorney at Law Office of Miryam Cissero

15247 Kenmore Station

Boston, MA 02115

Defendant Attorney

Danilo A. Borgas

Attorney at Sinapi Law Associates, Ltd.

2374 Post Road, Suite 201

Warwick, RI 02911

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Emergency MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraining Order by Claudia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Cissero, Miryam) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

7 #1

Supporting Memorandum of Law

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed order

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Danilo A. Borgas on behalf of Jesus P Lagos (Borgas, Danilo) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover and docketsheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Claudia Martinez against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7872113 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Claudia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover and docketsheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits)(Cissero, Miryam) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Jesus P Lagos. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibits

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jesus P Lagos. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Borgas, Danilo) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jesus P Lagos. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Borgas, Danilo) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Danilo A. Borgas on behalf of Jesus P Lagos (Borgas, Danilo) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: Electronic Order entered: The emergency motion of the Plaintiff, Claudia Martinez, for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #4 is DENIED. The plaintiff has failed to show that she is likely to suffer irreparable harm absent emergency relief as she acknowledges that she has been unable to access the premises of the business since on or after November 1, 2013. Additionally, the plaintiff's claim that there is a substantial risk that without injunctive relief she will see no recovery on a judgment is insufficient. Ross-Simons of Warwick, Inc. v. Baccarat, Inc., 102 F.3d 12, 19 (1st Cir. 1996) ("the plaintiff's showing must possess some substance; a preliminary injunction is not warranted by a tenuous or overly speculative forecast of anticipated harm"). (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Emergency MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraining Order by Claudia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Cissero, Miryam) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Jesus P Lagos. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Claudia Martinez against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7872113 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Claudia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover and docketsheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits)(Cissero, Miryam) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.