This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 07:40:54 (UTC).

Martinez v. James River Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against James River Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01646

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Jose Martinez

Defendant

James River Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Alexander

Attorney at Ryan Alexander, Chtd.

3017 West Charleston Blvd., Suite 58

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Deleela M. Ivey Weinerman

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & Omeara

1160 N Town Center Dr., Ste. 250

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Jared G Christensen

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & Omeara

1160 N Town Center Dr., Ste. 250

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Lucian Greco, Jr.

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara LLP

1160 N. Town Center Drive, Suite 250

Las Vegas, NV 89144

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Motions due by 6/17/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James River Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/11/2019.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JAMES RIVER GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent JAMES RIVER GROUP HOLDINGS, LTD, Corporate Parent BERMUDA for James River Insurance Company added. (Christensen, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796926-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5707901) by James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Motions due by 6/17/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James River Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/11/2019.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JAMES RIVER GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent JAMES RIVER GROUP HOLDINGS, LTD, Corporate Parent BERMUDA for James River Insurance Company added. (Christensen, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796926-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5707901) by James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.