This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:21:14 (UTC).

Martinez v. GEO Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Martinez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against GEO Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Levi Martinez

Eagle Pass, TX 78853

Defendants

State of Idaho

GEO Corrections

Idaho Correctional Center

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Levi Martinez.(jp) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE Plaintiff has 28 days within which to file an amended complaint as described. If Plaintiff does so, Plaintiff must file (along with the amended complaint) a Motion to Review the Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff does not amend within 28 days, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel (contained in the Complaint) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew the request for counsel in an amended complaint. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER for In Forma Pauperis Status and Withdrawal of Inmate Filing Fee from Prison Trust Account of Levi Martinez. Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. (Notice sent to Finance) Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (cc: Josh Tewalt)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

2 #1

cover sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Levi Martinez.(jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019: #1 cover sheet) (jp). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Levi Martinez. Responses due by 5/6/2019 (jp) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Levi Martinez.(jp) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE Plaintiff has 28 days within which to file an amended complaint as described. If Plaintiff does so, Plaintiff must file (along with the amended complaint) a Motion to Review the Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff does not amend within 28 days, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel (contained in the Complaint) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew the request for counsel in an amended complaint. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER for In Forma Pauperis Status and Withdrawal of Inmate Filing Fee from Prison Trust Account of Levi Martinez. Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. (Notice sent to Finance) Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (cc: Josh Tewalt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Levi Martinez. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Levi Martinez.(jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019: #1 cover sheet) (jp). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Levi Martinez. Responses due by 5/6/2019 (jp) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.