This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2019 at 07:55:16 (UTC).

Martinez v. City of Albuquerque et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Martinez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Albuquerque. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea and Jerry H. Ritter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00870

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Martinez

Defendants

City of Albuquerque

Alan Armijo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan L Williams

Attorney at Williams Injury Law, P.C.

4801 All Saints Rd Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87120

Defendant Attorneys

Jonlyn M Martinez

Attorney at Law Firm of Jonlyn M. Martinez

P O Box 1805, 105 14Th St. Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1805

Deborah D. Wells

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells PC

2201 San Pedro Ne, Building 3, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Albuquerque. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mary Martinez. (Williams, Bryan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah D. Wells on behalf of Alan Armijo (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #8 Motion for Leave to Provide Limited Representation (cbf) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#10

(#10) Defendant Alan Armijo's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for the Violation of Plaintiff's Right to Freedom of Speech by Alan Armijo. (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Alan Armijo re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION for Order for Leave to Provide Limited Scope Representation by Alan Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Mary Martinez Stipulated Extension Until October 15, 2019 for Plaintiff to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Williams, Bryan) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Albuquerque. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Filings

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Albuquerque from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-06935. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Albuquerque. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mary Martinez. (Williams, Bryan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah D. Wells on behalf of Alan Armijo (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #8 Motion for Leave to Provide Limited Representation (cbf) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • (#11) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Alan Armijo voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Wells, Deborah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant Alan Armijo's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for the Violation of Plaintiff's Right to Freedom of Speech by Alan Armijo. (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Alan Armijo re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Order for Leave to Provide Limited Scope Representation by Alan Armijo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Mary Martinez Stipulated Extension Until October 15, 2019 for Plaintiff to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Williams, Bryan) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Mary Martinez, 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by City of Albuquerque. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Mary Martinez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Williams, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#4) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), City of Albuquerque voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martinez, Jonlyn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Albuquerque. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (aek) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6684043 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by City of Albuquerque (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Albuquerque from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-06935. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan L Williams