This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:34:50 (UTC).

Martinez v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Martinez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01439

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sergio Martinez

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria Rizkalla Gerguis

Attorney at Daly & Black, P.C.

2211 Norfolk St Ste 800

Houston, TX 77098

Richard D Daly

Attorney at Daly & Black PC

2211 Norfolk St, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Sara E. Inman

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP

1717 Main St, Ste 5400

Dallas, TX 75206

Susan E Egeland

Attorney at Faegre Drinker, Biddle & Reath LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201-7367

Max A. Moran

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

1717 Main Street, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit F

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed.(Egeland, Susan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Inman on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. (Inman, Sara) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sergio Martinez, filed.(Gerguis, Maria) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sergio Martinez, filed.(Gerguis, Maria) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Max A. Moran on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. (Moran, Max) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Inman on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. (Inman, Sara) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed.(Egeland, Susan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Harris County, case number 2022-19158 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28132282) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Egeland, Susan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan E Egeland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara E. Inman