This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 08:33:20 (UTC).

Martinez-Iera et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Martinez-Iera filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01396

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aida Martinez Iera

Jose S. Sierra Maldonado

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline PLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Pfizer Corp.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

SANOFI-AVENTIC U.S. LLC

Acic Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Methapharm, Inc.

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Ajanta Pharma Ltd.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

AmeriSource Health Services LLC

77 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office PSC

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

4 #1

NEF - Condition Transfer Order 75

#5

#6

6 #1

Certified CTO-75

6 #2

Tag-Along Actions List

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase transferred out to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida through the extract civil case utility, e-mail sent to CMECF_CaseTransfers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (rim) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSFER LETTER from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-75 in MDL No. 2924 and List of Tag-Along Actions. Their case number is 9:20-md-02924-RLR. This Case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO-75, #2 Tag-Along Actions List) (rim) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from MDL No. 2924: Minute Order - To All Involved Clerks informing that a case transfer of this case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/10/2021. (rim) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL 2924, informing that this case forms part of CTO-75 for transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida and that the stay for CTO-75 has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 NEF - Condition Transfer Order 75) (rim) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of Aida Martinez Iera Responses due by 9/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7425798.), filed by Aida Martinez Iera. Service due by 11/22/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methapharm, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant