This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2021 at 09:49:04 (UTC).

Martinez et al v. State Farm Lloyds

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Martinez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Lloyds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Martinez

Isabell Martinez

Defendant

State Farm Lloyds

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaun W Hodge

Attorney at Hodge Law Firm PLLC

2211 Strand, Suite 302

Galveston, TX 77550

William D Taylor

Attorney at Taylor & Taylor Law PC

4115 Highgrove Dr.

Arlington, TX 76001

Katherine C Hairfield

Attorney at The Hodge Firm

2211 The Strand, Suite 302

Galveston, TX 77550

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandria Marie Twiss

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

1717 Main Street, Suite 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

Ashley S Bunyard

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Michael C Klein

Attorney at Dykema Cox Smith

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,, filed by State Farm Lloyds. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Twiss, Alexandria) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against State Farm Lloyds filed by James Martinez, Isabell Martinez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hairfield, Katherine) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Isabell Martinez, James Martinez. (Hairfield, Katherine) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss of Extra-Contractual Allegations and Brief in Support (12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Lloyds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D Taylor on behalf of Isabell Martinez, James Martinez. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (Twiss, Alexandria) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

1 #7

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #6

Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12023542) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,, filed by State Farm Lloyds. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Twiss, Alexandria) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against State Farm Lloyds filed by James Martinez, Isabell Martinez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hairfield, Katherine) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Isabell Martinez, James Martinez. (Hairfield, Katherine) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss of Extra-Contractual Allegations and Brief in Support (12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Lloyds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D Taylor on behalf of Isabell Martinez, James Martinez. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (Twiss, Alexandria) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12023542) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Bryan Dietzel is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Cora Hairfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William D Taylor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaun W Hodge