This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2021 at 09:00:47 (UTC).

Martinez et al v. Leggett & Platt Transportation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Leggett Platt Transportation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01086

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emmanuel Martinez

Lara Martinez

Defendants

Leggett & Platt Transportation, LLC

James Meszaros

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William M. Bloss

Attorney at Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, P.C.

350 Fairfield Ave.

Bridgeport, CT 06604

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emmanuel Martinez, Lara Martinez. All Defendants. (Bloss, William) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emmanuel Martinez, Lara Martinez. Leggett & Platt Transportation, LLC served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Bloss, William) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emmanuel Martinez, Lara Martinez. James Meszaros served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Bloss, William) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Leggett & Platt Transportation, LLC, James Meszaros* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William M. Bloss* *Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, P.C.* *350 Fairfield Ave.* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Emmanuel Martinez, Lara Martinez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2021. Discovery due by 2/10/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2022. Signed by Clerk on 08/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketJudge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Bloss, William) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Leggett & Platt Transportation, LLC, James Meszaros ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6608712.), filed by Emmanuel Martinez, Lara Martinez.(Bloss, William) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Leggett & Platt, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William M. Bloss